Recruitment Vision Nz Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429034475119) was incorporated on 16 Nov 2005. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington had been their registered address, up to 19 Mar 2020. 120 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 120 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Slack, Wayne John (a director) located at Buninyong, Victoria 3357. Businesscheck's information was updated on 05 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical & service | 19 Mar 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Wayne John Slack
Buninyong, Victoria 3357, 3357
Address used since 06 Mar 2019
Buninyong, Vic, 3357
Address used since 01 Jan 1970
Buninyong, Victoria 3357,
Address used since 01 Mar 2011 |
Director | 16 Nov 2005 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Findex House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 24 May 2019 - 19 Mar 2020 |
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 06 May 2019 - 24 May 2019 |
Level 1, Crowe Horwath House, 57 Willis Street, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 18 Jul 2016 - 06 May 2019 |
Level 6, Westfield Tower, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt, 5010 | Registered & physical | 11 Mar 2014 - 18 Jul 2016 |
Crowe Horwath, L6, 45 Knights Road, Lower Hutt, Wellington, 5010 | Registered & physical | 19 Feb 2014 - 11 Mar 2014 |
C/- Grant Thornton New Zealand Ltd, L4, 152 Fanshawe Street, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 03 Sep 2013 - 19 Feb 2014 |
Level 27, 188 Quay Street, Auckland 1010 | Registered & physical | 16 Mar 2009 - 03 Sep 2013 |
Pwc Tower, Level 27, 188 Quay Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 17 Jul 2006 - 16 Mar 2009 |
Grant Thornton Auckland Limited, 97-101 Hobson Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 16 Nov 2005 - 17 Jul 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Slack, Wayne John Director |
Buninyong Victoria 3357 |
01 Mar 2011 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Slack, Wayne John Individual |
Buninyong Victoria 3357, Australia |
16 Nov 2005 - 01 Mar 2011 |
Mcauley Finance Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Beco Builders & Contractors Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Abby Builders Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Lausanne Office Services Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Active Communications Limited Level 4, Willbank House |
|
Hania Street Limited Level 4, Willbank House |