New Level Developments Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429034582923) was started on 25 Aug 2005. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: Floor 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 (type: registered, physical). Level 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin had been their registered address, up to 13 Sep 2022. 99 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 99 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Grenfell, Warwick Leslie (an individual) located at Waitati, Waitati postcode 9085. The Businesscheck database was updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Floor 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin Central, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical & service | 13 Sep 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Warwick Leslie Grenfell
Waitati, Waitati, 9085
Address used since 09 Feb 2017 |
Director | 02 Mar 2006 - current |
Claire Grenfell
Kew, Dunedin, 9012
Address used since 11 Sep 2019
Waitati, Waitati, 9085
Address used since 09 Feb 2017 |
Director | 24 Apr 2013 - current |
Geoffrey John Mcmillan
Mornington, Dunedin,
Address used since 25 Aug 2005 |
Director | 25 Aug 2005 - 02 Sep 2008 |
Paula-jean Powell
Seacliff, Dunedin,
Address used since 25 Aug 2005 |
Director | 25 Aug 2005 - 01 Sep 2008 |
Kimberly May Romeril
Andersons Bay, Dunedin,
Address used since 25 Aug 2005 |
Director | 25 Aug 2005 - 02 Mar 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered & physical | 20 Sep 2021 - 13 Sep 2022 |
Level 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered | 21 May 2019 - 20 Sep 2021 |
Level 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical | 29 Sep 2011 - 21 May 2019 |
Level 1, Westpac Building, 106 George Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Registered | 19 Jul 2011 - 21 May 2019 |
Pricewaterhousecoopers, Forsyth Barr House, The Octagon, Dunedin | Physical | 08 Feb 2008 - 29 Sep 2011 |
Pricewaterhousecoopers, Forsyth Barr House, The Octagon, Dunedin 9058 | Registered | 08 Feb 2008 - 19 Jul 2011 |
24 The Octagon, Dunedin | Physical & registered | 31 Mar 2006 - 08 Feb 2008 |
29 Kilgour Street, Seacliff, Dunedin | Physical & registered | 25 Aug 2005 - 31 Mar 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Grenfell, Warwick Leslie Individual |
Waitati Waitati 9085 |
02 Mar 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Powell, Paula-jean Individual |
Seacliff Dunedin |
25 Aug 2005 - 02 Mar 2006 |
Romeril, Kimberly May Individual |
Andersons Bay Dunedin |
25 Aug 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Mcmillan, Geoffrey John Individual |
Mornington Dunedin |
25 Aug 2005 - 03 Sep 2008 |
Teresa Chan Law Trustee 2014 Limited Westpac Building Level 3, |
|
Trueform Products Limited Level 4 Westpac Building |
|
The Bendigo Valley Sports And Charity Foundation 6 Westpac Trust Building |
|
The Old Karitane Store Limited Westpac Building, 106 George Street |
|
Southern Critical Care Trust Pwc |
|
Drti Holdings Limited 10 George Street |