Max Rowsell Rural Services Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429034681169) was registered on 28 Jun 2005. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Withers Building, 21 Neville Street, Warkworth, 0910 (type: registered, physical). Withers Building, 23 Neville Street, Warkworth had been their registered address, up to 12 Feb 2021. Max Rowsell Rural Services Limited used other aliases, namely: M J Rowsell Valuation Limited from 28 Jun 2005 to 19 Jan 2022. 1000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 2 entities and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Rowsell, Catherine Rose (an individual) located at Rd 6, Point Wells postcode 0986,
Catherine Rowsell (a director) located at Rd 6, Point Wells postcode 0986. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Rowsell, Maxwell John (an individual) - located at Point Wells, Warkworth. Our database was last updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Withers Building, 23 Neville Street, Warkworth, 0910 | Service & physical | 10 Nov 2010 |
Withers Building, 21 Neville Street, Warkworth, 0910 | Registered | 12 Feb 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Maxwell John Rowsell
Point Wells, Warkworth, 0986
Address used since 28 Jun 2005 |
Director | 28 Jun 2005 - current |
Catherine Rose Rowsell
Rd 6, Point Wells, 0986
Address used since 16 Sep 2019 |
Director | 16 Sep 2019 - 17 Jan 2022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Withers Building, 23 Neville Street, Warkworth, 0910 | Registered | 10 Nov 2010 - 12 Feb 2021 |
Bavage Chapman Knight Ltd, 51 Morrison Drive, Warkworth | Registered & physical | 04 Mar 2009 - 10 Nov 2010 |
C/-darren Knight & Associates Limited, 17 Neville Street, Warkworth | Registered & physical | 12 Mar 2007 - 04 Mar 2009 |
C/-m A Sharp & Associates, 17 Neville Street, Warkworth | Registered & physical | 28 Jun 2005 - 12 Mar 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rowsell, Catherine Rose Individual |
Rd 6 Point Wells 0986 |
01 Oct 2019 - current |
Catherine Rose Rowsell Director |
Rd 6 Point Wells 0986 |
01 Oct 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rowsell, Maxwell John Individual |
Point Wells Warkworth |
28 Jun 2005 - current |
Warkworth Surveyors Limited Withers Building, 23 Neville Street |
|
Bean Building Limited Withers Building, 23 Neville Street |
|
Mckergow Builders Limited Withers Building, 23 Neville Street |
|
Entourage NZ Limited Withers Building, 23 Neville Street |
|
Withers & Co Trustee Company (2008) Limited Withers Building, 23 Neville Street |
|
Elleco Limited Withers Building, 23 Neville Street |