175 Old Farm Road Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034742907) was started on 30 May 2005. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 15 Summer Eve Place, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 (type: physical, service). 8 Raupo Place, Matamata, Matamata had been their registered address, up to 14 Oct 2022. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Joe, Adrian Ken (an individual) located at Matamata, Matamata postcode 3400. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (exactly 50 shares); it includes
Joe, Arlene (an individual) - located at Matamata, Matamata. "Rental of residential property" (business classification L671160) is the category the ABS issued to 175 Old Farm Road Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
15 Summer Eve Place, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 | Registered | 14 Oct 2022 |
15 Summer Eve Place, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 | Physical & service | 01 Nov 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Adrian Ken Joe
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 01 Sep 2022
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 01 Nov 2015 |
Director | 30 May 2005 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
8 Raupo Place, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 | Registered | 21 Feb 2018 - 14 Oct 2022 |
8 Raupo Place, Matamata, Matamata, 3400 | Physical | 21 Feb 2018 - 01 Nov 2022 |
517 New North Road, Kingsland, Auckland, 1021 | Physical & registered | 09 Dec 2014 - 21 Feb 2018 |
517 New North Road, Kingsland, Auckland | Physical & registered | 26 Nov 2009 - 09 Dec 2014 |
279 Gillies Ave, Epsom, Auckland | Physical | 29 Apr 2009 - 26 Nov 2009 |
8 Raupo Place, Matamata, New Zealand | Registered | 30 May 2005 - 26 Nov 2009 |
8 Raupo St, Matamata, New Zealand | Registered & physical | 30 May 2005 - 30 May 2005 |
8 Raupo Place, Matamata, New Zealand | Physical | 30 May 2005 - 30 May 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Joe, Adrian Ken Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
30 May 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Joe, Arlene Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
31 Mar 2011 - current |
Adrian Joe Limited 8 Raupo Place |
|
Wallace Wells And Wilson Enterprises Limited 11b Raupo Place |
|
Matamata Memorial Rsa Welfare And Charitable Trust Matamata Rsa |
|
Matamata Bridge Club Incorporated Matamata Bridge Club |
|
Nac Trustee Company Limited 83 Findlater Street |
|
Stratford Cafe & Bakery Limited 83 Findlater Street |
Om Buildings Limited 1 Meura Street |
Wd & Jd Wilson Limited 20 Arawa Street |
Branch Property Limited 20 Arawa Street |
Adline Limited 20 Arawa Street |
Click Housing Limited 20 Arawa Street |
Fraser-ball Limited 35 Rohe Road |