Joseph Petelo Trustee Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429034768105) was launched on 13 May 2005. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Level 2, 83 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 (type: registered, service). Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch had been their registered address, up to 04 Oct 2021. 2 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 2 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Petelo, Paulette Hazel (a director) located at Rolleston, Rolleston postcode 7615. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch, 8144 | Physical | 01 Jun 2017 |
Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch, 8144 | Registered | 04 Oct 2021 |
Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch, 8144 | Service | 02 Dec 2022 |
Level 2, 83 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & service | 03 Nov 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paulette Hazel Petelo
Rolleston, Rolleston, 7615
Address used since 15 Dec 2016 |
Director | 13 May 2005 - current |
Sharon Maria Wedlock
Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013
Address used since 13 Oct 2010 |
Director | 13 May 2005 - 15 Dec 2016 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 83 Victoria Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8013 | Registered & service | 03 Nov 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, Building One, 181 High Street, Christchurch, 8144 | Registered | 01 Jun 2017 - 04 Oct 2021 |
92 Russley Road, Russley, Christchurch, 8042 | Registered & physical | 28 Apr 2016 - 01 Jun 2017 |
433 St Asaph Street, Phillipstown, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 30 Oct 2012 - 28 Apr 2016 |
C/- Searell & Co Limited, 314 St Asaph Street, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical | 03 Aug 2011 - 30 Oct 2012 |
314 St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered | 03 Aug 2011 - 30 Oct 2012 |
C/-searell & Co Ltd, Level 1, 148 Victoria Street, Christchurch 8013 | Registered & physical | 18 May 2009 - 03 Aug 2011 |
Nicoll Cooney Silva, Barristers & Solicitors, 243 Tancred Street, Ashburton 7700 | Physical & registered | 09 Mar 2007 - 18 May 2009 |
Welsh Mccarthy, Solicitors, 46 High Street, Hawera | Physical & registered | 13 May 2005 - 09 Mar 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Petelo, Paulette Hazel Director |
Rolleston Rolleston 7615 |
13 Feb 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Wedlock, Sharon Maria Individual |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 |
13 May 2005 - 15 Dec 2016 |
Petelo, Paulette Hazel Individual |
Rolleston Christchurch 7615 |
13 May 2005 - 13 Feb 2017 |
Montreal 248 Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
Kaikoura Music Festival Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
Cai Residential Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
M & S Bradley Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
880 Main North Road Limited Level 2, Building One |
|
Win Sor 45 Limited Level 2, Building One |