Virtue Trustees Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429034831892) was started on 07 Apr 2005. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 2, 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, service). 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 04 Sep 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Houghton, Alexander Ernest (an individual) located at Saint Johns, Auckland postcode 1072. Our database was updated on 21 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & service & registered | 04 Sep 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Alexander Ernest Houghton
Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072
Address used since 24 Feb 2020
Newmarket, 1023
Address used since 01 Jul 2010 |
Director | 01 Jul 2010 - current |
Gregory Martin Virtue
Orakei, Auckland 1070,
Address used since 31 Mar 2010 |
Director | 31 Mar 2010 - 01 Jul 2010 |
Daniel Martin Virtue
Newmarket, Auckland,
Address used since 07 Apr 2005 |
Director | 07 Apr 2005 - 31 Mar 2010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
18 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 07 Apr 2005 - 04 Sep 2020 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Houghton, Alexander Ernest Individual |
Saint Johns Auckland 1072 |
07 Apr 2005 - current |
Marita Investments Limited 18 Broadway |
|
Ross Five Limited 18 Broadway |
|
Localcloud Limited 18 Broadway |
|
Mangawhai Heads Management Limited 18 Broadway |
|
Blackmore Virtue And Owens Limited 18 Broadway |
|
W. & B. Wharfe Limited 18 Broadway |