N F T H Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429034861509) was registered on 30 Mar 2005. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, Plaza House, 243 Princes Street, Dunedin, 9016 (type: physical, registered). G S Mclauchlan & Co, Stafford House Level 3, 2 Stafford Street, Dunedin had been their registered address, up to 18 Nov 2010. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 20 shares (20 per cent of shares), namely:
Heffernan, Nichola Mary (an individual) located at Allenton, Ashburton postcode 7700. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 40 per cent of all shares (exactly 40 shares); it includes
Heffernan, Therese (an individual) - located at Allenton, Ashburton. The third group of shareholders, share allotment (40 shares, 40%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Heffernan, Felicity Ellen Bernadette, located at Surry Hills, Sydney (an individual). Businesscheck's data was updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Plaza House, 243 Princes Street, Dunedin, 9016 | Physical & registered & service | 18 Nov 2010 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Felicity Ellen Bernadette Heffernan
Surry Hills, Sydney, 2011
Address used since 22 Sep 2023
Rd 1, Christchurch, 7671
Address used since 01 Apr 2016 |
Director | 30 Mar 2005 - current |
Nichola Mary Heffernan
Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 22 Sep 2023
Bondi, Nsw, 2026
Address used since 21 Jun 2019
Flat 4, 54 Derby Street, St Albans, Christchurch, 8014
Address used since 01 Apr 2016 |
Director | 26 Nov 2006 - current |
Therese Heffernan
Allenton, Ashburton, 7700
Address used since 01 Apr 2016 |
Director | 26 Nov 2006 - current |
Ellen Anne Ramsey
Otago,
Address used since 30 Mar 2005 |
Director | 30 Mar 2005 - 23 Nov 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
G S Mclauchlan & Co, Stafford House Level 3, 2 Stafford Street, Dunedin | Registered & physical | 21 May 2007 - 18 Nov 2010 |
C/-g S Mclauchlan & Co., 2 Stafford Street, Dunedin | Physical & registered | 30 Mar 2005 - 21 May 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heffernan, Nichola Mary Individual |
Allenton Ashburton 7700 |
22 Jun 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heffernan, Therese Individual |
Allenton Ashburton 7700 |
22 Jun 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Heffernan, Felicity Ellen Bernadette Individual |
Surry Hills Sydney 2011 |
30 Mar 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ramsey, Ellen Anne Individual |
Otago |
30 Mar 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Airport Shuttles Dunedin Limited Level 1 Plaza House |
|
Cjs Group 2011 Limited 243 Princes Street |
|
1804 Limited Level 1, Plaza House |
|
H & J Flooring Limited Level 1 Plaza House |
|
High Excitement Limited Level 1, Plaza House |
|
Timshel Consulting Limited Level 1, Plaza House |