G&T Investments Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429034875438) was started on 18 Mar 2005. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 45 Lytton Street, Glenholme, Rotorua, 3010 (type: registered, physical). 6 Stafford Rise, Lynmore, Rotorua, Nz had been their physical address, up until 27 Apr 2011. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Terry, Tarrin Jane (an individual) located at Glenholme, Rotorua postcode 3010. "Investment - residential property" (ANZSIC L671150) is the classification the ABS issued G&T Investments Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 23 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
45 Lytton Street, Glenholme, Rotorua, 3010 | Registered & physical & service | 27 Apr 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Tarrin Jane Terry
Glenholme, Rotorua 3010, 3010
Address used since 15 Apr 2011 |
Director | 18 Mar 2005 - current |
Gerard Francis Terry
Glenholme, Rotorua 3010, 3010
Address used since 28 Apr 2016 |
Director | 18 Mar 2005 - 06 Dec 2020 |
45 Lytton Street , Glenholme , Rotorua , 3010 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
6 Stafford Rise, Lynmore, Rotorua, Nz | Physical | 19 Mar 2008 - 27 Apr 2011 |
6 Stafford Rise, Lynmore, Rotorua | Registered | 19 Mar 2008 - 27 Apr 2011 |
22 Sumner Street, Glenholme, Rotorua | Physical | 18 Mar 2005 - 19 Mar 2008 |
8a Seddon Street, Glenholme, Rotorua | Registered | 18 Mar 2005 - 19 Mar 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Terry, Tarrin Jane Individual |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 |
05 Nov 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lock, Tarrin Jane Individual |
Glenholme Rotorua |
18 Mar 2005 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Terry, Gerard Francis Individual |
Glenholme Rotorua 3010 |
18 Mar 2005 - 24 Mar 2021 |
T. J. Terry Consulting Limited 45 Lytton Street |
|
R J & A J Rentals Limited 36a Holland Street |
|
NZ View Incorporated 36a Holland Street |
|
Millwood Investments Limited 25 Sumner Street |
|
Waiteata Investments Limited 25 Sumner Street |
|
Koru Limited 31 Holland Street |
12 Lions Limited 24b Sophia Street |
Lam Family Trustees Limited 88 Ranolf Street |
C & R Lam Trustees Limited 88 Ranolf Street |
Taurus Trustees Limited 1230a Amohau Street |
Anaco Limited 6 Garden Place |
Tawavale Properties Limited 1153 Hinemoa Street |