Rf & Pj Macdonald Limited (issued a business number of 9429034978122) was incorporated on 25 Jan 2005. 1 address is in use by the company: 929 Waimatenui Road, Nukutawhiti, Kaikohe, 0474 (type: physical, registered). 85 Waimatenui Road, Kaikohe had been their physical address, up to 27 Jul 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98% of shares), namely:
Paddy Macdonald (an individual) located at Kaikohe,
Tw Trustees 2017 Limited (an entity) located at Whangarei postcode 0142,
Roderick Macdonald (an individual) located at Kaikohe. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Paddy Macdonald (an individual) - located at Kaikohe. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allocation (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Roderick Macdonald, located at Kaikohe (an individual). Businesscheck's data was last updated on 09 Sep 2022.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
929 Waimatenui Road, Nukutawhiti, Kaikohe, 0474 | Physical & registered | 27 Jul 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Roderick Falconer Macdonald
Kaikohe, 0474
Address used since 24 Jul 2015 |
Director | 25 Jan 2005 - current |
Paddy Josephine Macdonald
Kaikohe, 0474
Address used since 24 Jul 2015 |
Director | 25 Jan 2005 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
85 Waimatenui Road, Kaikohe, 0474 | Physical & registered | 18 Aug 2009 - 27 Jul 2016 |
85 Waimatenui Road, Whangarei | Registered & physical | 25 Jan 2005 - 18 Aug 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paddy Josephine Macdonald Individual |
Kaikohe |
25 Jan 2005 - current |
Tw Trustees 2017 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046229205 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Whangarei 0142 |
20 Feb 2018 - current |
Roderick Falconer Macdonald Individual |
Kaikohe |
25 Jan 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Paddy Josephine Macdonald Individual |
Kaikohe |
25 Jan 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Roderick Falconer Macdonald Individual |
Kaikohe |
25 Jan 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Grant Lindsay Currie Individual |
Whangarei |
30 May 2005 - 20 Feb 2018 |
Waoku Development Trust C/o Taheke Post Office Main Rd Taheke |