Bbg Pastoral Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429034999431) was incorporated on 17 Jan 2005. 3 addresses are in use by the company: 38K Lunn Ave, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1072 (type: registered, physical). Flat 5, 38B Lunn Avenue, Mount Wellington, Auckland had been their registered address, until 04 Jul 2019. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Exbbgt Limited (In Liq) (an entity) located at St Heliers, Auckland 1740. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
237c Tamaki Drive, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 23 Jun 2015 |
38k Lunn Ave, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1072 | Registered & physical & service | 04 Jul 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gregory Martin Olliver
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 28 Oct 2020
St Heliers, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Oct 2013
Glendowie, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 23 Jul 2018 |
Director | 17 Jan 2005 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Flat 5, 38b Lunn Avenue, Mount Wellington, Auckland, 1072 | Registered & physical | 31 Jul 2018 - 04 Jul 2019 |
237c Tamaki Drive, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Physical & registered | 01 Jul 2015 - 31 Jul 2018 |
26 St Heliers Bay Road, St Heliers, Auckland 1740 | Registered & physical | 28 Sep 2009 - 01 Jul 2015 |
26 St Heliers Bay Road, St Heliers, Auckland 1071 | Registered | 16 Oct 2008 - 28 Sep 2009 |
Taurus Accounting Solutions Ltd, Level 3, Landsborough House, 287 Durham Street, Christchurch | Physical | 17 Jan 2006 - 28 Sep 2009 |
Level 28, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay Street, Auckland | Physical | 17 Jan 2005 - 17 Jan 2006 |
Level 28, Pricewaterhousecoopers Tower, 188 Quay St, Auckland | Registered | 17 Jan 2005 - 16 Oct 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Exbbgt Limited (in Liq) Shareholder NZBN: 9429038148682 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
St Heliers Auckland 1740 |
17 Jan 2005 - current |
Riddell Trust Limited 237c Tamaki Drive |
|
Green Fever Limited 237c Tamaki Road |
|
Tamaki Drive Limited 237 Tamaki Drive |
|
J L Shelf Co Limited 237c Tamaki Drive |
|
Lornie & Co Accountants Limited 237c Tamaki Drive |
|
Gerontious Enterprises Limited 237c Tamaki Drive |