Total Pos Rentals Limited (issued a business number of 9429035026587) was started on 17 Dec 2004. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Unit 7, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 (type: delivery, postal). 144A St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch had been their registered address, up until 09 Aug 2017. Total Pos Rentals Limited used other names, namely: Peregrine Finance Limited from 17 Dec 2004 to 06 Nov 2009. 120 shares are allotted to 6 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 30 shares (25% of shares), namely:
O'brien, Debra Anne (an individual) located at Burnside, Christchurch postcode 8053. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 3 shareholders hold 50% of all shares (60 shares); it includes
Ross, Martin John (an individual) - located at Cashmere, Christchurch,
Ross, Judith Mary (an individual) - located at Cashmere, Christchurch,
Pf Trustee No.1 Limited (an entity) - located at Riccarton, Christchurch. Moving on to the next group of shareholders, share allocation (30 shares, 25%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
O'brien, Michael William, located at Khandallah, Wellington (an individual),
O'brien, William Hall, located at Northwood, Christchurch (an individual). "Business machine, equipment - wholesaling - except computing equipment or furniture" (business classification F349405) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Total Pos Rentals Limited. The Businesscheck database was last updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 7, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Physical & registered & service | 09 Aug 2017 |
Unit 7, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Delivery & office | 02 Mar 2022 |
Po Box 1503, Christchurch, Christchurch, 8140 | Postal | 02 Mar 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Martin John Ross
Cashmere, Christchurch, 8022
Address used since 14 Jul 2016 |
Director | 17 Dec 2004 - current |
William Hall O'brien
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 13 Mar 2023
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 18 Jul 2018
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 19 Mar 2010 |
Director | 17 Dec 2004 - current |
Unit 7, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue , Christchurch Central , Christchurch , 8011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
144a St Asaph Street, Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011 | Registered & physical | 09 Mar 2012 - 09 Aug 2017 |
147 Kilmore Street, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 18 Jun 2008 - 09 Mar 2012 |
2nd Floor, 137 Victoria Street, Christchurch | Physical & registered | 01 Feb 2005 - 18 Jun 2008 |
Unit 8, 166 Moorhouse Ave, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 17 Dec 2004 - 01 Feb 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'brien, Debra Anne Individual |
Burnside Christchurch 8053 |
17 Dec 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ross, Martin John Individual |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 |
17 Dec 2004 - current |
Ross, Judith Mary Individual |
Cashmere Christchurch 8022 |
17 Dec 2004 - current |
Pf Trustee No.1 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037366544 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Riccarton Christchurch 8041 |
17 Dec 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'brien, Michael William Individual |
Khandallah Wellington 6035 |
25 Feb 2022 - current |
O'brien, William Hall Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
17 Dec 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Richardson, Gerard Patrick Individual |
Cnr Durham And Gloucester Streets Christchurch |
17 Dec 2004 - 27 Mar 2023 |
Richardson, Gerard Patrick Individual |
Cnr Durham And Gloucester Streets Christchurch |
17 Dec 2004 - 27 Mar 2023 |
Richardson, Gerard Patrick Individual |
Cnr Durham And Gloucester Streets Christchurch |
17 Dec 2004 - 27 Mar 2023 |
Richardson, Gerard Patrick Individual |
Cnr Durham And Gloucester Streets Christchurch |
17 Dec 2004 - 27 Mar 2023 |
Poscom Limited Unit 7, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue |
|
Head To Tail Limited Unit 2a, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue |
|
Pure Hifi Limited Unit 2, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue |
|
Total Pos Solutions Limited Unit 7, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue |
|
The Cash Register Doctor Limited Unit 7, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue |
|
Ezypay Limited Unit 2a, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue |
Poscom Limited Unit 7, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue |
The Cash Register Doctor Limited Unit 7, 100 Fitzgerald Avenue |
Business Distributors Limited 456 Moorhouse Avenue |
The Coffee Workshop Canterbury Limited Unit 4,35 Sir William Pickering Drive |
The Point Of Sale Company Limited 270a Queen Street |
Bluepak Supplies Limited 26 Oak Avenue |