Hickey & Neal Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429035064176) was registered on 23 Nov 2004. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 (type: registered, physical). 109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth had been their physical address, up to 29 Aug 2019. 1200 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 359 shares (29.92% of shares), namely:
Neal, David Mark (an individual) located at Rd 32, Opunake postcode 4682. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 29.83% of all shares (exactly 358 shares); it includes
Neal, Paula Jane (an individual) - located at Rd 32, Opunake. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (483 shares, 40.25%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Hickey, Nola Faye, located at New Plymouth, New Plymouth (an individual). The Businesscheck data was updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Registered & physical & service | 29 Aug 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nola Faye Hickey
New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310
Address used since 27 Feb 2014 |
Director | 23 Nov 2004 - current |
David Mark Neal
Rd 32, Opunake, 4682
Address used since 31 Aug 2014 |
Director | 23 Nov 2004 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
109 Powderham Street, New Plymouth, New Plymouth, 4310 | Physical & registered | 09 Oct 2014 - 29 Aug 2019 |
C/-peter Jones, 10a Beach Street, New Plymouth | Registered & physical | 22 Apr 2005 - 09 Oct 2014 |
Peter Jones Chartered Accountants, 63 Devon Street West, New Plymouth | Registered & physical | 23 Nov 2004 - 22 Apr 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Neal, David Mark Individual |
Rd 32 Opunake 4682 |
23 Nov 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Neal, Paula Jane Individual |
Rd 32 Opunake 4682 |
23 Nov 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hickey, Nola Faye Individual |
New Plymouth New Plymouth 4310 |
23 Nov 2004 - current |
T & L Uhlenberg Trustee Limited 109 Powderham Street |
|
Gordon Monmouth Trustee Company Limited 109-113 Powderham Street |
|
Rbs Invest Limited 109 Powderham Street |
|
Kotuku (2012) Limited 2nd Floor, Staples Rodway Bldg |
|
I & N Butler Nominees Limited 109-113 Powderham Street |
|
Soil And Plant Health Limited 109 Powderham Street |