Elbee Trustee Limited (issued a business number of 9429035167327) was registered on 21 Sep 2004. 5 addresess are in use by the company: C/O Whaley Garnett, P O Box 17181, Greenlane, Auckland, 1546 (type: postal, office). Whaley & Garnett, Level 1, 217 Great South Rd, Greenlane, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 18 Oct 2012. 10 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 3 shares (30 per cent of shares), namely:
Garnett, Gavin Ian (an individual) located at Herne Bay, Auckland. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 30 per cent of all shares (exactly 3 shares); it includes
Garnett, Annabelle Yvonne Mary (a director) - located at Westmere, Auckland. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (4 shares, 40%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Garnett, Joshua Kirk, located at Westmere, Auckland (an individual). "Trustee service" (ANZSIC K641965) is the classification the ABS issued Elbee Trustee Limited. Businesscheck's information was updated on 20 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 217 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 | Registered & physical & service | 18 Oct 2012 |
C/o Whaley Garnett, P O Box 17181, Greenlane, Auckland, 1546 | Postal | 12 Oct 2020 |
Level 1, 217 Great South Road, Greenlane, Auckland, 1051 | Office & delivery | 12 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Gavin Ian Garnett
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 21 Sep 2004 |
Director | 21 Sep 2004 - current |
Joshua Kirk Garnett
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 05 Nov 2015 |
Director | 31 May 2006 - current |
Annabelle Yvonne Mary Garnett
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 05 Nov 2015 |
Director | 18 Oct 2007 - current |
Mary Ellen Whaley
Freemans Bay, Auckland,
Address used since 21 Sep 2004 |
Director | 21 Sep 2004 - 18 Oct 2007 |
Level 1 , 217 Great South Road, Greenlane , Auckland , 1051 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Whaley & Garnett, Level 1, 217 Great South Rd, Greenlane, Auckland | Registered & physical | 12 Oct 2005 - 18 Oct 2012 |
Whaley & Garnett, 1st Floor Westpac Building, 217 Great South Rd, Greenlane, Auckland | Registered & physical | 21 Sep 2004 - 12 Oct 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Garnett, Gavin Ian Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland |
21 Sep 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Garnett, Annabelle Yvonne Mary Director |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
17 Oct 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Garnett, Joshua Kirk Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
15 Jun 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Whaley, Mary Ellen Individual |
Freemans Bay Auckland |
21 Sep 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Cummings Common Wealth Investments Limited 217 Great South Road |
|
Nyemecz Veenhuijsen Trustee Limited 217 Great South Road |
|
Boag Independent Trustee Limited Level 1 |
|
Kent Independent Trustee Limited Level 1 |
|
Sue Independent Trustee Limited Level 1 |
|
Mccondach Independent Trustee Limited Level 1 |
Nyemecz Veenhuijsen Trustee Limited 217 Great South Road |
Boag Independent Trustee Limited Level 1 |
Kent Independent Trustee Limited Level 1 |
Sue Independent Trustee Limited Level 1 |
Mccondach Independent Trustee Limited Level 1 |
Hamilton Independent Trustee Limited Level 1 |