Shard Investments Limited (issued a business number of 9429035224921) was started on 18 Aug 2004. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 (type: physical, service). Apartment 803 59 France, 59 France Street South, Eden Terrace, Auckland had been their registered address, until 12 Aug 2022. Shard Investments Limited used more names, namely: Compton Investments Limited from 18 Aug 2004 to 18 Aug 2004. 100 shares are allotted to 3 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 3 entities and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Compton, Richard Graham (an individual) located at Eden Terrace, Auckland postcode 1010,
Brett, Marguerite Anne (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland 1050,
Compton, Shane Catherine (an individual) located at Eden Terrace, Auckland postcode 1010. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & service & registered | 12 Aug 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard Graham Compton
Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 27 Jul 2022
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 31 May 2010 |
Director | 18 Aug 2004 - current |
Shane Catherine Compton
Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 27 Jul 2022
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 31 May 2010 |
Director | 18 Aug 2004 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Apartment 803 59 France, 59 France Street South, Eden Terrace, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & physical | 04 Aug 2022 - 12 Aug 2022 |
Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 12 Feb 2021 - 04 Aug 2022 |
Level 2, 24 Johnston Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 13 Sep 2017 - 12 Feb 2021 |
Level 6, 22 Panama Street, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & registered | 04 May 2016 - 13 Sep 2017 |
Level 5 203-209 Willis Street, Wellington, 6142 | Registered & physical | 23 May 2014 - 04 May 2016 |
Level 2, Thorndon Rise, 95 Molesworth St, Thorndon, Wellington, 6011 | Registered & physical | 21 Jun 2013 - 23 May 2014 |
C/-matthew Underwood Limited, Level 4, 191 Thorndon Quay, Thorndon, Wellington 6011 | Registered & physical | 30 Nov 2009 - 21 Jun 2013 |
C/-matthew Underwood Limited, Level 4, 191 Thorndon Quay, Thorndon, Wellington | Registered & physical | 13 Mar 2008 - 30 Nov 2009 |
29 Friend Street, Karori, Wellington | Registered & physical | 18 Aug 2004 - 13 Mar 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Compton, Richard Graham Individual |
Eden Terrace Auckland 1010 |
18 Aug 2004 - current |
Brett, Marguerite Anne Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
18 Aug 2004 - current |
Compton, Shane Catherine Individual |
Eden Terrace Auckland 1010 |
18 Aug 2004 - current |
Assure Legal Limited Level 1, 79 Taranaki Street |
|
B+lnz Genetics Limited Level 4, 154 Featherston Street |
|
Ignition Films Limited Level 4, 111 Customhouse Quay |
|
Stewart Baillie Limited Level 3, 44 Victoria Street |
|
Tbfree New Zealand Limited Level 9, 15 Willeston Street |
|
Ospri New Zealand Limited Level 9, 15 Willeston Street |