Backstop Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035306627) was incorporated on 29 Jun 2004. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 46 Amyes Road, Hornby, Christchurch, 8042 (type: office, physical). 46 Amyes Road Hornby, Hornby, 46 Amyes, Rd, Hornby, 46 Amyes Rd, Hornby had been their registered address, up until 07 May 2008. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Elson, David Stuart (an individual) located at Christchurch 8042, Christchurch postcode 8042. "Farm irrigation service" (ANZSIC A052943) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Backstop Limited. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
46 Amyes Road, Christchurch 8042 | Other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister (Address For Share Register) | 30 Apr 2008 |
46 Amyes Road, Hornby, Christchurch, 8042 | Physical & registered & service | 07 May 2008 |
46 Amyes Road, Hornby, Christchurch, 8042 | Office | 26 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Stuart Elson
Hornby, Christchurch, 8042
Address used since 09 Nov 2015 |
Director | 29 Jun 2004 - current |
Caroline Patricia Elson
Hornby, Christchurch,
Address used since 30 Aug 2006 |
Director | 29 Jun 2004 - 30 Apr 2008 |
46 Amyes Road , Hornby , Christchurch , 8042 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
46 Amyes Road Hornby, Hornby, 46 Amyes, Rd, Hornby, 46 Amyes Rd, Hornby | Registered | 13 Jun 2007 - 07 May 2008 |
46 Amyes Road Hornby, Hornby, Christchurch | Physical | 13 Jun 2007 - 07 May 2008 |
92a Fisher Parade, Pakuranga, Auckland | Physical & registered | 29 Jun 2004 - 13 Jun 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Elson, David Stuart Individual |
Christchurch 8042 Christchurch 8042 |
29 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Elson, Caroline Patricia Individual |
Hornby Christchurch |
29 Jun 2004 - 06 Jun 2007 |
Hpcc Business Life Charitable Trust 27 Amyes Road |
|
Presss Limited 21 Brampton Drive |
|
Enstruct Limited 21 Brampton Drive |
|
Earthquake Associates Limited 21 Brampton Drive |
|
Leonidas Investments Limited 103 Blankney Street |
|
Tm Investment Holdings Limited 50 Brynley Street |
Terraces Irrigation Limited 605 Deep Creek Road |
Claxby Irrigation Limited 287-293 Durham Street North |
Lifestyle Irrigation Limited 461 Oxford Road |
Weka Irrigators Limited 684 Weka Pass Road |
Irrigator Servicing Limited 151 Burnett Street |
Hunter Downs Water Limited 4e Sefton Street East |