Sls Electronic Security Limited (NZBN 9429035327325) was started on 18 Jun 2004. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 24 Parkway Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 (type: registered, service). Wbb Chartered Accountants Ltd, 31 Anzac Street, Takapuna, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 01 Mar 2006. Sls Electronic Security Limited used other names, namely: Cctv New Zealand Limited from 18 Jun 2004 to 19 Apr 2005. 120 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 60 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Butler, Michael John (an individual) located at Rd 2, Albany postcode 0792. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 60 shares); it includes
Riches, Robert (an individual) - located at Long Bay, Auckland. Our data was updated on 01 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 111 Hurstmere Road, Takapuna, Auckland | Registered & physical & service | 01 Mar 2006 |
24 Parkway Drive, Rosedale, Auckland, 0632 | Registered & service | 08 Mar 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Robert Riches
Long Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 19 Apr 2021
Long Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 22 Oct 2020
Browns Bay, North Shore City, 0630
Address used since 27 Feb 2009
Long Bay, Auckland, 0630
Address used since 01 Mar 2019 |
Director | 13 Jan 2005 - current |
Michael John Butler
Rd 2, Albany, 0792
Address used since 01 Mar 2017 |
Director | 13 Jan 2005 - current |
Duncan Nash
Beachhaven,
Address used since 04 Dec 2004 |
Director | 04 Dec 2004 - 13 Jan 2005 |
Damon Hing
Howick,
Address used since 04 Dec 2004 |
Director | 04 Dec 2004 - 13 Jan 2005 |
Lisa Hopper
Kaurilands,
Address used since 18 Jun 2004 |
Director | 18 Jun 2004 - 06 Dec 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Wbb Chartered Accountants Ltd, 31 Anzac Street, Takapuna, Auckland | Registered & physical | 24 Jan 2005 - 01 Mar 2006 |
71a Portage Road, Otahuhu, Auckland | Registered & physical | 13 Dec 2004 - 24 Jan 2005 |
25 Kaurilands Road, Kaurilands | Registered & physical | 18 Jun 2004 - 13 Dec 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Butler, Michael John Individual |
Rd 2 Albany 0792 |
17 Jan 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Riches, Robert Individual |
Long Bay Auckland 0630 |
17 Jan 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hing, Damon Individual |
Howick |
04 Dec 2004 - 04 Dec 2004 |
Nash, Duncan Individual |
Beachhaven |
04 Dec 2004 - 04 Dec 2004 |
Hopper, Lisa Individual |
Kaurilands |
18 Jun 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Portland Group Trustee Limited Level 10, Bdo Tower, 19 Como Street |
|
Samz Holdings Limited Level 1, 111 Hurstmere Road |
|
Frimley Holdings Limited Level 2, 74 Taharoto Road |
|
Black Sand Furniture Limited Level 1, 111 Hurstmere Road |
|
Sw Stakeholder Services Limited Level 3, Takapuna Finance Centre, 159 Hurstmere Road |
|
Wtp New Zealand Holdings Limited Level 1, 111 Hurstmere Road |