Tiri Holdings Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429035384373) was incorporated on 25 May 2004. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 81 Hokonui Drive, Gore, Gore, 9710 (type: physical, registered). Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House, 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch had been their physical address, until 15 May 2017. Tiri Holdings Limited used other names, namely: Teri Holdings Limited from 28 Oct 2010 to 04 Nov 2010, Waimak Alpine Jet Limited (02 Nov 2005 to 28 Oct 2010) and Waimak Alpine Jet (2004) Limited (25 May 2004 - 02 Nov 2005). 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Raymond, David Archdall (an individual) located at Highfield, Timaru postcode 7910,
Raymond, Caroline Jill (an individual) located at Highfield, Timaru postcode 7910. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
81 Hokonui Drive, Gore, Gore, 9710 | Physical & registered & service | 15 May 2017 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Archdall Raymond
Highfield, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 25 May 2021
Rd 1, Picton, 7281
Address used since 05 May 2010 |
Director | 25 May 2004 - current |
Caroline Jill Raymond
Highfield, Timaru, 7910
Address used since 25 May 2021
Rd 1, Picton, 7281
Address used since 05 May 2010 |
Director | 25 May 2004 - current |
Gritt Maria Raymond
Springfield 8170, Canterbury,
Address used since 25 May 2004 |
Director | 25 May 2004 - 01 Apr 2009 |
Warner James Archdall Raymond
Springfield 8170, Canterbury,
Address used since 25 May 2004 |
Director | 25 May 2004 - 01 Apr 2009 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, Ainger Tomlin House, 136 Ilam Road, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 | Physical & registered | 08 May 2015 - 15 May 2017 |
12 Sayers Crescent, Ilam, Christchurch, 8041 | Registered & physical | 07 May 2012 - 08 May 2015 |
Ainger Tomlin Ltd, Level 1-116 Riccarton Road, Riccarton, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 07 May 2007 - 07 May 2012 |
Ainger Tomlin Ltd, Level 1-116 Riccarton Road, Ami Building, Riccarton, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 10 Nov 2006 - 07 May 2007 |
Brown Glassford & Co. Ltd, Level 1, 55 Kilmore Street, Christchurch | Physical | 10 Mar 2005 - 10 Nov 2006 |
Brown Glassford & Co. Ltd, Level 1, 55 Kilmore Street, Chrstchurch | Registered | 10 Mar 2005 - 10 Nov 2006 |
53 West Coast Road, Springfield 8170, Canterbury | Registered & physical | 25 May 2004 - 10 Mar 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Raymond, David Archdall Individual |
Highfield Timaru 7910 |
25 May 2004 - current |
Raymond, Caroline Jill Individual |
Highfield Timaru 7910 |
25 May 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Raymond, Warner James Archdall Individual |
Springfield 8170 Canterbury |
25 May 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Raymond, Gritt Maria Individual |
Springfield 8170 Canterbury |
25 May 2004 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Blue Dinah Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
Terrace Hill Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
Frantzy Fencing Plus Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
L A Holdings 2013 Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
Harrex Group Trustee Company 2013 Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |
|
Benio Downs Limited 81 Hokonui Drive |