Solum Consulting Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429035387817) was launched on 03 Jun 2004. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: 158 Kanuka Rise, R D 1, Wakapuaka, Nelson, 7071 (type: postal, office). 158 Kanuka Rise, Rd 1, Nelson had been their registered address, until 16 Mar 2016. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 99 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Haynes, David Anthony (an individual) located at R D 1, Wakapuaka, Nelson postcode 7071. "Artist" (business classification R900207) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Solum Consulting Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
639 Glenfield Road, Glenfield, North Shore, Auckland, 0629 | Physical & service | 21 Mar 2011 |
158 Kanuka Rise, R D 1, Wakapuaka, Nelson, 7071 | Registered | 16 Mar 2016 |
158 Kanuka Rise, R D 1, Wakapuaka, Nelson, 7071 | Postal & office & delivery | 11 Jul 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Anthony Haynes
R D 1, Wakapuaka, Nelson, 7071
Address used since 07 Mar 2014 |
Director | 03 Jun 2004 - current |
158 Kanuka Rise , R D 1 , Wakapuaka, Nelson , 7071 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
158 Kanuka Rise, Rd 1, Nelson, 7071 | Registered | 17 Mar 2014 - 16 Mar 2016 |
158 Kanuka Rise, Wakapuaka, R D 1, Nelson, 7071 | Registered | 21 Mar 2011 - 17 Mar 2014 |
158 Kanuka Rise, Wakapuaka, R D 1, Nelson 7071 | Registered | 04 Dec 2009 - 21 Mar 2011 |
15 Cochran Road, Oratia, Auckland 0604 | Registered | 19 Feb 2008 - 04 Dec 2009 |
15 Cochran Road, Oratia, Auckland | Registered | 27 Mar 2007 - 19 Feb 2008 |
639 Glenfield Road, Glenfield, North Shore, Auckland 0629 | Physical | 20 Mar 2007 - 21 Mar 2011 |
14 Seymour Street, Saint Mary' S Bay, Auckland 1011 | Registered | 20 Mar 2007 - 20 Mar 2007 |
15 Cochran Road, Oratia, Auckland | Registered | 02 Aug 2006 - 20 Mar 2007 |
14 Seymour Street, Saint Mary's Bay, Auckland 1001 | Registered | 18 Apr 2006 - 18 Apr 2006 |
14 Seymour Street, Saint Mary's Bay, Auckland 1001 | Registered | 22 Mar 2006 - 18 Apr 2006 |
639 Glenfield Road, Glenfield, Auckland 1310 | Physical | 29 Nov 2005 - 20 Mar 2007 |
14 Seymour Street, Saint Mary's Bay, Auckland 1001 | Registered | 29 Nov 2005 - 22 Mar 2006 |
14 Seymour Street, St Mary's Bay, Auckland | Registered & physical | 03 Jun 2004 - 29 Nov 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Haynes, David Anthony Individual |
R D 1 Wakapuaka, Nelson 7071 |
03 Jun 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Buonaguidi-haynes, Serena Claudia Individual |
R D 1 Wakapuaka, Nelson 7071 |
26 Mar 2007 - 26 Mar 2007 |
Buonaguidi-haynes, Serena Claudia Individual |
Oratia Auckland |
26 Mar 2007 - 26 Mar 2007 |
Discover Ease Limited 129 Kanuka Rise |
|
Innovations Nelson Limited 42 Kanuka Rise |
|
Applied Maintenance Technology Limited 185 Parautane Way |
|
The Centre For Fine Woodworking Trust Board Thackwood Farm Drive |
|
Karewarewa Innovations Consultancy (kic) Limited 79 Todd Bush Road |
|
Global Prospects Limited 63 Todd Bush Road |
Maunga Limited 6 Penny Street |
Kokowai Limited 9 Rototai Road |
Katim Limited 43 Versailles Street |
Donna Mckenna Studio Limited 75 Cecil Road |
Melissa Young Sculpting Limited 13 Kellsmere Crescent |
Lakos Limited 120a Buckley Road |