Potters Clay Nelson (2004) Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429035637998) was started on 28 Nov 2003. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 29 Wakefield-Kohatu Highway, Rd 1, Wakefield, 7095 (type: registered, physical). Main Road, Fox Hill, Wakefield, Nelson had been their registered address, until 23 Apr 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Eggers, Kelvin Claude (an individual) located at Rd 1, Wakefield postcode 7095. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
29 Wakefield-kohatu Highway, Rd 1, Wakefield, 7095 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Apr 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Kelvin Claude Eggers
Rd 1, Wakefield, 7095
Address used since 27 Apr 2021
Foxhill, Wakefield, Nelson, 7095
Address used since 04 May 2016 |
Director | 28 Nov 2003 - current |
Raelyn Edna Peters
Rd 1, Wakefield, 7095
Address used since 27 Apr 2021
Foxhill, Wakefield, Nelson, 7095
Address used since 04 May 2016 |
Director | 28 Nov 2003 - 28 Aug 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Main Road, Fox Hill, Wakefield, Nelson, 7095 | Registered & physical | 19 Apr 2021 - 23 Apr 2021 |
74 Whitby Road, Wakefield, Wakefield, 7025 | Registered & physical | 21 May 2018 - 19 Apr 2021 |
9 Strawbridge Square, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Registered & physical | 10 May 2016 - 21 May 2018 |
46 Acheron Drive, Riccarton, Christchurch, 8041 | Physical & registered | 09 Jun 2015 - 10 May 2016 |
9 Strawbridge Square, Stoke, Nelson, 7011 | Physical & registered | 31 Jan 2014 - 09 Jun 2015 |
21 Tasman Street, The Wood, Nelson, 7010 | Registered & physical | 05 Jul 2013 - 31 Jan 2014 |
Brown & Associates, Chartered Accountants, 54 Montgomery Square, Nelson | Registered & physical | 28 Nov 2003 - 05 Jul 2013 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Eggers, Kelvin Claude Individual |
Rd 1 Wakefield 7095 |
28 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peters, Raelyn Edna Individual |
Rd 1 Wakefield 7095 |
28 Nov 2003 - 28 Mar 2024 |
Smart Engineering Services Limited 9 Strawbridge Square |
|
Vanilla Bean Cafe (2016) Limited 9 Strawbridge Square |
|
Ceiling Wool Insulation Limited 9 Strawbridge Square |
|
Stay Safe NZ Limited 9 Strawbridge Square |
|
Meribel Olives Limited 9 Strawbridge Square |
|
Blanchett Trustees Limited 9 Strawbridge Square |