Matamata Medical Centre Limited (issued a business number of 9429035649311) was launched on 23 Dec 2003. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 20 Arawa St, Matamata (type: physical, registered). 2520 shares are allocated to 12 shareholders who belong to 8 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 315 shares (12.5% of shares), namely:
King Country Health Care Limited (an entity) located at Taumarunui postcode 3920. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 2 shareholders hold 12.5% of all shares (exactly 315 shares); it includes
Jh Trustee 2015 Limited (an entity) - located at Matamata,
Thrupp, Steven Francis (an individual) - located at Matamata, Matamata. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allotment (315 shares, 12.5%) belongs to 3 entities, namely:
Cg Trustee 2018 Limited, located at Matamata (an entity),
Shaw Ross, Stephanie Lea, located at Matamata, Matamata (an individual),
Ross, Benjamin Wade, located at Matamata, Matamata (an individual). The Businesscheck information was updated on 30 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Arawa St, Matamata | Physical & registered & service | 23 Dec 2003 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Bruce Nelson Pitchford
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 04 Mar 2020
Matamata, 3400
Address used since 29 Feb 2016 |
Director | 23 Dec 2003 - current |
William Newby Varty
Leamington, Cambridge, 3432
Address used since 04 Mar 2020
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 01 Feb 2013 |
Director | 23 Dec 2003 - current |
Benjamin Wade Ross
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 02 Jul 2018 |
Director | 02 Jul 2018 - current |
Steven Francis Thrupp
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 02 Mar 2023
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 04 Mar 2020
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 22 Feb 2019 |
Director | 22 Feb 2019 - current |
Julie Mary Jones
Te Poi, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 06 Mar 2023 |
Director | 06 Mar 2023 - current |
Eldon Pitchford
Melville, Hamilton, 3206
Address used since 24 Mar 2023 |
Director | 24 Mar 2023 - current |
Hannah Louise Annesley
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 24 Mar 2023 |
Director | 24 Mar 2023 - current |
Kiran Patel
Taumarunui, Taumarunui, 3920
Address used since 07 Jun 2023 |
Director | 07 Jun 2023 - current |
Gregory Lawrence Dunn
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 10 Mar 2014 |
Director | 23 Dec 2003 - 03 Jun 2022 |
Reuben James Tomlinson
Matamata, Matamata, 3400
Address used since 22 Dec 2016 |
Director | 22 Dec 2016 - 08 Mar 2022 |
Fayez Mosaad Khalil
Cambridge, Cambridge, 3434
Address used since 26 Feb 2019
Rd 2, Matamata, 3472
Address used since 01 Feb 2013 |
Director | 06 Aug 2010 - 22 Mar 2019 |
Andrew Robert Minett
Leamington, Cambridge, 3432
Address used since 29 Feb 2016 |
Director | 23 Dec 2003 - 29 Jun 2018 |
Craig Henry Campbell
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 17 Feb 2010 |
Director | 23 Dec 2003 - 29 Jul 2016 |
Adrian Paul Ireland
R D 3, Matamata,
Address used since 26 Jan 2007 |
Director | 23 Dec 2003 - 30 Jan 2009 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
King Country Health Care Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037363192 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Taumarunui 3920 |
06 Jun 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jh Trustee 2015 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041753224 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Matamata 3400 |
04 Mar 2019 - current |
Thrupp, Steven Francis Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
04 Mar 2019 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cg Trustee 2018 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046547729 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Matamata 3400 |
16 Jul 2018 - current |
Shaw Ross, Stephanie Lea Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
16 Jul 2018 - current |
Ross, Benjamin Wade Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
16 Jul 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Matamata Medical Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037894658 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
25 Aug 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Varty, Rosemary Ross Individual |
Leamington Cambridge 3432 |
27 Aug 2010 - current |
Varty, William Newby Individual |
Leamington Cambridge 3432 |
23 Dec 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tymis Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429049044485 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Melville Hamilton 3206 |
06 Mar 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hannah Yule Medical Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051064204 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
06 Mar 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jones, Julie Mary Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
06 Mar 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Tomlinson, Emma Kate Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
22 Dec 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Khalil, Bernadette Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
27 Aug 2010 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Drysdale-dunn, Barbara Patricia Individual |
Matamata 3400 |
27 Aug 2010 - 26 Jan 2022 |
Pitchford, Bruce Nelson Individual |
Matamata |
23 Dec 2003 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Bell & Graham Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041511756 Company Number: 5507486 Entity |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
22 Dec 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Osbornes Professional Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037630096 Company Number: 951789 Entity |
Chartered Accountants Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga Null |
27 Aug 2010 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Dunn, Gregory Lawrence Individual |
Matamata |
23 Dec 2003 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Tomlinson, Reuben James Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
22 Dec 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Tomlinson, Reuben James Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
22 Dec 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Khalil, Bernadette Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
27 Aug 2010 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Campbell, Craig Henry Individual |
Rd3 Hamilton |
23 Dec 2003 - 27 Aug 2010 |
Cg Trustee 2009 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032438260 Company Number: 2199274 Entity |
20 Arawa Street Matamata 3400 Null |
27 Aug 2010 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Osbornes Professional Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037630096 Company Number: 951789 Entity |
Chartered Accountants Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga Null |
27 Aug 2010 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Bell & Graham Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041511756 Company Number: 5507486 Entity |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
22 Dec 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Brockie, Robin Individual |
R D 3 Tauranga 3173 |
27 Aug 2010 - 10 Mar 2014 |
Tomlinson, Emma Kate Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
22 Dec 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Ireland, Adrian Paul Individual |
R D 3 Matamata |
23 Dec 2003 - 31 Jan 2007 |
Dunn, Gregory Lawrence Individual |
Matamata |
23 Dec 2003 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Dunn, Timothy Samuel Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
26 Jan 2022 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Dunn, Timothy Samuel Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
26 Jan 2022 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Osbornes Professional Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037630096 Company Number: 951789 Entity |
Chartered Accountants Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga Null |
27 Aug 2010 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Osbornes Professional Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037630096 Company Number: 951789 Entity |
Chartered Accountants Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga Null |
27 Aug 2010 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Osbornes Professional Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037630096 Company Number: 951789 Entity |
Chartered Accountants Tuhoro Street, Otorohanga Null |
27 Aug 2010 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Dunn, Gregory Lawrence Individual |
Matamata |
23 Dec 2003 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Dunn, Gregory Lawrence Individual |
Matamata |
23 Dec 2003 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Dunn, Gregory Lawrence Individual |
Matamata |
23 Dec 2003 - 13 Jun 2022 |
Tomlinson, Reuben James Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
22 Dec 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Tomlinson, Emma Kate Individual |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
22 Dec 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Bell & Graham Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041511756 Company Number: 5507486 Entity |
Matamata Matamata 3400 |
22 Dec 2016 - 22 Mar 2022 |
Drysdale-dunn, Barbara Patricia Individual |
Matamata 3400 |
27 Aug 2010 - 26 Jan 2022 |
Drysdale-dunn, Barbara Patricia Individual |
Matamata 3400 |
27 Aug 2010 - 26 Jan 2022 |
Candy, Alan Bruce Individual |
Rd 2 Matamata 3472 |
27 Aug 2010 - 29 Jun 2018 |
Minett, Andrew Robert Individual |
Leamington Cambridge 3432 |
23 Dec 2003 - 29 Jun 2018 |
Khalil, Fayez Mosaad Individual |
Cambridge Cambridge 3434 |
27 Aug 2010 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Khalil, Fayez Mosaad Individual |
Rd 2 Matamata 3472 |
27 Aug 2010 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Cg Trustee 2009 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032438260 Company Number: 2199274 Entity |
20 Arawa Street Matamata 3400 Null |
27 Aug 2010 - 01 Apr 2019 |
Craig Corp Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036269747 Company Number: 1250167 Entity |
27 Aug 2010 - 10 Aug 2016 | |
Minett, Elaine Individual |
Matamata 3400 |
27 Aug 2010 - 29 Jun 2018 |
Craig Corp Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036269747 Company Number: 1250167 Entity |
27 Aug 2010 - 10 Aug 2016 |
Becks Nurseries 1998 Limited 20 Arawa Street, Matamata |
|
Stanlyn Hardware Limited 20 Arawa Street |
|
Richard Wine Limited 20 Arawa Street |
|
Shaune Ritchie Racing Limited 20 Arawa Street, Matamata |
|
Cyh Limited 20 Arawa Street |
|
Nickel Builders Limited 20 Arawa Street |