Rosebrook Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429035653400) was started on 21 Nov 2003. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Level 4, 21 Queen Street, Auckland, 1001 (type: postal, office). Christmas Gouwland, Level 12, 23 Customs Street East, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 29 Oct 2013. 10000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 9990 shares (99.9% of shares), namely:
Smith, Julia Maree (an individual) located at Surfers Paradise, Auckland postcode 4217. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1% of all shares (exactly 10 shares); it includes
Smith, Julia Maree (an individual) - located at Surfers Paradise, Auckland. "Management consultancy service" (ANZSIC M696245) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Rosebrook Limited. Businesscheck's database was updated on 04 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 4, 21 Queen Street, Auckland, 1001 | Physical & registered & service | 29 Oct 2013 |
Level 4, 21 Queen Street, Auckland, 1001 | Postal & office & delivery | 04 Feb 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Julia Maree Smith
Surfers Paradise, Queensland, 4217
Address used since 22 Jul 2023
Bundall, Queensland, 4217
Address used since 01 Jul 2022
Epsom, Auckland, 1023
Address used since 29 Jun 2015 |
Director | 21 Nov 2003 - current |
Jason Paul Roberts
Devonport, North Shore City, New Zealand,
Address used since 21 Nov 2003 |
Director | 21 Nov 2003 - 06 Aug 2007 |
Level 4, 21 Queen Street , Auckland , 1001 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Christmas Gouwland, Level 12, 23 Customs Street East, Auckland, 1001 | Registered | 29 Feb 2012 - 29 Oct 2013 |
Christmas Gouwland Limited, Level 12, Citigroup Centre, 23 Customs Street East, Auckland | Physical | 22 Jun 2009 - 29 Oct 2013 |
Christmas Gouwland, Level 12, Citigroup, Centre, 23 Customs Str East, Auckland | Registered | 22 Jun 2009 - 29 Feb 2012 |
Christmasgouwlandbasrur, Level 12, Citigroup Centre, 23 Customs Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 10 Jun 2009 - 22 Jun 2009 |
Level 6, 14 Viaduct Harbour Avenue, Auckland | Registered & physical | 30 Jul 2007 - 10 Jun 2009 |
21 St Aubyn Street, Devonport, North Shore City, New Zealand | Registered & physical | 21 Nov 2003 - 30 Jul 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smith, Julia Maree Individual |
Surfers Paradise Auckland 4217 |
21 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Smith, Julia Maree Individual |
Surfers Paradise Auckland 4217 |
21 Nov 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig, Ron Individual |
Ponsonby Auckland 1011 |
02 Feb 2019 - 04 Feb 2023 |
Roberts, Jason Paul Individual |
Devonport North Shore City, New Zealand |
21 Nov 2003 - 07 Aug 2007 |
Wear, Jayne Nicola Individual |
Herne Bay Auckland 1011 |
17 Aug 2007 - 02 Feb 2019 |
Bucklands Beach Investments Limited Level 6, 59 High Street |
|
Maui Finance Limited Level 10, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Rosenthal Trustee Company Limited Level 14, 34 Shortland Street |
|
Lzy Trustee Company Limited Level 1, 2 Princes Street |
|
New Zealand Academic And Learning Institute Limited Level 29, 188 Quay Street |
|
Rennie Cox Trustees No.7 Limited Level 15, 126 Vincent Street |
Mcgredy Winder & Co. Limited Level 6, 41 Shotland Street |
Retail Focus Group Limited Level 15, 120 Albert Street |
The Independent Optometry Group Limited Level 7, 63 Albert Street |
Kenward Group Limited Level 3, 18 Shortland Street |
Qualmark New Zealand Limited Level 1, 1 Nelson Street |
K3 Consulting Limited 83 Albert Street (entrance At Kingston Street) |