Enzet Global Trading Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429035783343) was started on 18 Sep 2003. 6 addresess are currently in use by the company: 36 Southern Cross Road, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 (type: service, physical). 29 Thomas Peacock Place, Saint Johns, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 21 Sep 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Evangelista, Romeo (an individual) located at Kohimarama, Auckland postcode 1071. "Employment placement service (candidates and contractors)" (ANZSIC N721130) is the category the ABS issued to Enzet Global Trading Limited. Our data was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
36 Southern Cross Road, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Registered | 08 Sep 2006 |
36 Southern Cross Road, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Postal & office & delivery | 05 Sep 2019 |
18 Great South Road, Otahuhu, Auckland, 1062 | Physical & service | 21 Sep 2021 |
36 Southern Cross Road, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Service | 04 Oct 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Romeo Gerardo P Evangelista
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 13 Nov 2020 |
Director | 13 Nov 2020 - current |
Romeo Gerardo Posadas Evangelista
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 13 Nov 2020 |
Director | 13 Nov 2020 - current |
Melina Evangelista
Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071
Address used since 01 Apr 2005 |
Director | 01 Apr 2005 - 13 Nov 2020 |
Romeo Evangelista
Remuera, Auckland, New Zealand,
Address used since 18 Sep 2003 |
Director | 18 Sep 2003 - 26 Oct 2005 |
Yong Cheng Hu
Bucklands Beach, Auckland,
Address used since 01 Apr 2005 |
Director | 01 Apr 2005 - 26 Oct 2005 |
Stephen Sik Fun Wong
East Tamaki, Auckland, New Zealand,
Address used since 01 Oct 2004 |
Director | 18 Sep 2003 - 01 Apr 2005 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
36 Southern Cross Road, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Service | 04 Oct 2023 |
36 Southern Cross Road , Kohimarama , Auckland , 1071 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
29 Thomas Peacock Place, Saint Johns, Auckland, 1072 | Physical | 16 Jun 2021 - 21 Sep 2021 |
36 Southern Cross Road, Kohimarama, Auckland, 1071 | Physical | 08 Sep 2006 - 16 Jun 2021 |
37c Dornwell Road, Mt. Roskill, Auckland, New Zealand | Physical & registered | 18 Sep 2003 - 08 Sep 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Evangelista, Romeo Individual |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
26 Oct 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cmb Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036271900 Company Number: 1249714 Entity |
12 Nov 2004 - 12 Nov 2004 | |
Hu, Yong Cheng Individual |
Bucklands Beach Auckland |
08 Jun 2005 - 08 Jun 2005 |
Wong, Stephen Sik Fun Individual |
Dannemore Auckland, New Zealand |
18 Sep 2003 - 12 Nov 2004 |
Evangelista, Melina Individual |
Kohimarama Auckland 1071 |
26 Oct 2005 - 13 Nov 2020 |
Cmb Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036271900 Company Number: 1249714 Entity |
12 Nov 2004 - 12 Nov 2004 | |
Chinese Media Bureau Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036271900 Company Number: 1249714 Entity |
12 Nov 2004 - 12 Nov 2004 | |
Chinese Media Bureau Group Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036271900 Company Number: 1249714 Entity |
12 Nov 2004 - 12 Nov 2004 | |
Evangelista, Romeo Individual |
Remuera Auckland, New Zealand |
18 Sep 2003 - 08 Jun 2005 |
Harvest Is Ripe Asia-new Zealand 36 Southern Cross Road |
|
Brown Fox Limited 21 Godfrey Place |
|
Casa Giftware New Zealand Limited 32 Southern Cross Road |
|
Jae.jae Design Limited 2/15 Godfrey Place |
|
Thinkworks Coaching Limited 18a Godfrey Place |
|
Alla Trustee Holdings Limited 3/28 Southern Cross |
3pchange Limited 50 Allum Street |
Hoffman Consulting Limited Flat 1, 114 Gowing Drive |
Morstaff Limited 10 Maheke Street |
Hatchco Limited 55 Temple Street |
The Uk Experience Limited 21a Kelvin Road |
Interface Recruitment New Zealand Limited 26 Garin Way |