Wellerandco Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035828167) was incorporated on 19 Aug 2003. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 23 Brown Street, Tauranga, 3110 (type: registered, physical). 23 Brown Street, Tauranga, Tauranga had been their physical address, up to 29 Jul 2021. 1200 shares are allotted to 7 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 830 shares (69.17% of shares), namely:
Weller, Suzanne Margaret (an individual) located at Ilam, Christchurch postcode 8041,
Weller, Hilary Leigh (an individual) located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch postcode 8011. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.83% of all shares (exactly 10 shares); it includes
Weller, Hilary Leigh (an individual) - located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch. Moving on to the 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (180 shares, 15%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Weller, Hilary Leigh, located at Christchurch Central, Christchurch (an individual),
Weller, John Robert, located at Northwood, Christchurch (an individual). Our information was updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
23 Brown Street, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical & service | 29 Jul 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Suzanne Margaret Weller
Ilam, Christchurch, 8041
Address used since 10 Sep 2013 |
Director | 19 Aug 2003 - current |
John Robert Weller
Northwood, Christchurch, 8051
Address used since 12 Sep 2022
Rd 1, Darfield, 7571
Address used since 23 Sep 2013 |
Director | 19 Aug 2003 - current |
Hilary Leigh Weller
Christchurch Central, Christchurch, 8011
Address used since 16 Jan 2023
Papanui, Christchurch, 8053
Address used since 04 Sep 2009 |
Director | 19 Dec 2005 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
23 Brown Street, Tauranga, Tauranga, 3110 | Physical & registered | 14 Oct 2019 - 29 Jul 2021 |
141 Cameron Road, Tauranga, 3110 | Registered & physical | 26 Nov 2012 - 14 Oct 2019 |
L B Dawson & Associates Limited, Chartered Accountants, First Floor, 126 Eleventh Ave, Tauranga | Registered & physical | 15 Jun 2006 - 26 Nov 2012 |
195 Snodgrass Road, Tauranga | Physical & registered | 19 Aug 2003 - 15 Jun 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Weller, Suzanne Margaret Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
19 Aug 2003 - current |
Weller, Hilary Leigh Individual |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
23 Nov 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Weller, Hilary Leigh Individual |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
23 Nov 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Weller, Hilary Leigh Individual |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
23 Nov 2006 - current |
Weller, John Robert Individual |
Northwood Christchurch 8051 |
19 Aug 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Weller, Suzanne Margaret Individual |
Ilam Christchurch 8041 |
19 Aug 2003 - current |
Weller, Hilary Leigh Individual |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8011 |
23 Nov 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pingao Trustee 407 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046502100 Company Number: 6595097 Entity |
23 Jul 2019 - 10 Jun 2020 | |
R J Barry Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038007231 Company Number: 873656 Entity |
525 Cameron Road Tauranga 3110 |
23 Nov 2006 - 23 Jul 2019 |
Duncan Cotterill Christchurch Trustee (2013) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030380851 Company Number: 4221158 Entity |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 |
25 Mar 2015 - 23 Jul 2019 |
Pingao Trustee 407 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046502100 Company Number: 6595097 Entity |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
23 Jul 2019 - 10 Jun 2020 |
Duncan Cotterill Christchurch Trustee (2013) Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030380851 Company Number: 4221158 Entity |
Christchurch Central Christchurch 8013 |
25 Mar 2015 - 23 Jul 2019 |
R J Barry Trustee Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038007231 Company Number: 873656 Entity |
525 Cameron Road Tauranga 3110 |
23 Nov 2006 - 23 Jul 2019 |
Ripley, Jack Individual |
Rd6 West Melton, Christchurch 7676 |
19 Aug 2003 - 25 Mar 2015 |
Michael And Kathy Sass Limited 141 Cameron Road |
|
Kiwiclog's Dustbusters Limited 141 Cameron Road |
|
Rowan Tree Charitable Trust Manning Warner |
|
Sadgrove Charitable Trust Manning Warner |
|
Zanz Limited Partnership Manning Warner Browne Limited |