Mindful Adventures Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429035890621) was incorporated on 09 Jul 2003. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 58 Crescent Road West, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 (type: physical, registered). 58 Crescent Rd East Extension, Ostend, Waiheke, Auckland had been their registered address, up to 01 Aug 2018. 100 shares are allocated to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 99 shares (99 per cent of shares), namely:
Burrell, Richard John (an individual) located at St Heliers, Auckland,
Markwick, Lisa Jessie (an individual) located at Ostend, Waiheke Island postcode 1081. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Markwick, Lisa Jessie (an individual) - located at Ostend, Waiheke Island. "Management consultancy service" (ANZSIC M696245) is the category the ABS issued Mindful Adventures Limited. Businesscheck's data was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
58 Crescent Road West, Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081 | Physical & registered & service | 01 Aug 2018 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lisa Jessie Markwick
Waiheke, Auckland, 1081
Address used since 26 Jul 2017
Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011
Address used since 26 Jul 2015
Ostend, Waiheke Island, 1081
Address used since 24 Jul 2018 |
Director | 09 Jul 2003 - current |
58 Crescent Road West , Ostend , Waiheke Island , 1081 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
58 Crescent Rd East Extension, Ostend, Waiheke, Auckland, 1081 | Registered & physical | 04 Aug 2017 - 01 Aug 2018 |
23/67 Sarsfield Street, Herne Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Physical & registered | 03 Aug 2015 - 04 Aug 2017 |
2/39 Wood Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland, 1011 | Physical | 09 Aug 2010 - 03 Aug 2015 |
2/39 Wood Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland | Registered | 19 Jul 2004 - 03 Aug 2015 |
2/39 Wood Street, Freemans Bay, Auckland | Physical | 19 Jul 2004 - 09 Aug 2010 |
22/7 Cleveland Road, Parnell, Auckland, New Zealand | Registered & physical | 09 Jul 2003 - 19 Jul 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Burrell, Richard John Individual |
St Heliers Auckland |
06 Jul 2005 - current |
Markwick, Lisa Jessie Individual |
Ostend Waiheke Island 1081 |
06 Jul 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Markwick, Lisa Jessie Individual |
Ostend Waiheke Island 1081 |
09 Jul 2003 - current |
Kara Building Limited 51 Crescent Road East |
|
Choc N Roll Waiheke Limited 52 Crescent Road East |
|
We'ar Righteous Limited 33 Crescent Road West |
|
Lasavia Limited 37 Crescent Road West |
|
Cazador Properties Limited 56 Crescent Road West |
|
Green And Serene Limited 14 Crescent Road West |
Leadership Mentoring NZ Limited 11 Hauraki Road |
The Heritage Studio Limited 53 Goodwin Avenue |
Peacock Ridge Limited 70 Trig Hill Road |
Marshall & Marshall Limited 161 Nick Johnstone Drive |
Obrienz Limited 203 Orapiu Road |
Projectonic Limited 259 Maraetai Drive |