Windale Farms Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429035992318) was started on 15 May 2003. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 1A Douglas Street, Kensington, Whangarei, 0112 (type: physical, service). 1A Douglas Street, Kensington, Whangarei had been their registered address, until 04 Sep 2019. 1000 shares are allotted to 4 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (10 per cent of shares), namely:
Hood, Paul Andrew (an individual) located at Hanmer Springs, Hanmer Springs postcode 7360. As far as the second group is concerned, a total of 1 shareholder holds 10 per cent of all shares (exactly 100 shares); it includes
Hood, Lynette Kay Catherine (an individual) - located at Hanmer Springs, Hanmer Springs. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (800 shares, 80%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Hood, Paul Andrew, located at Hanmer Springs, Hanmer Springs (an individual),
Ness, Simon Paul, located at South Island (an individual). The Businesscheck information was updated on 04 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1a Douglas Street, Kensington, Whangarei, 0112 | Physical & service & registered | 04 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Andrew Hood
Hanmer Springs, Hanmer Springs, 7360
Address used since 13 Sep 2018
Hanmer Springs, 7334
Address used since 24 Sep 2015 |
Director | 15 May 2003 - current |
Lynette Kay Catherine Hood
Hanmer Springs, Hanmer Springs, 7360
Address used since 13 Sep 2018
Hanmer Springs, 7334
Address used since 24 Sep 2015 |
Director | 21 Sep 2006 - current |
Lynette Kay Catherine Gendall
R D 1, Culverden,
Address used since 17 Aug 2003 |
Director | 17 Aug 2003 - 21 Sep 2006 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
1a Douglas Street, Kensington, Whangarei, 0112 | Registered & physical | 03 Oct 2014 - 04 Sep 2019 |
C/-johnston O'shea Ltd, 9-11 Reyburn Street, Whangarei | Registered & physical | 01 Oct 2009 - 03 Oct 2014 |
C/o Johnston O'shea Ltd, Third Floor, 4 Vinery Lane, Whangarei | Physical & registered | 28 Sep 2006 - 01 Oct 2009 |
C/-paul Hood, Rotherham Road, Rd1, Culverden | Registered & physical | 15 Feb 2005 - 28 Sep 2006 |
C/o Johnston O'shea Ltd, Third Floor, 4 Vinery Lane, Whangarei | Registered & physical | 23 Sep 2004 - 15 Feb 2005 |
C/- Johnston Billington Limited, Chartered Accountants, 4 Vinery Lane, Whangarei | Physical & registered | 15 May 2003 - 23 Sep 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hood, Paul Andrew Individual |
Hanmer Springs Hanmer Springs 7360 |
15 May 2003 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hood, Lynette Kay Catherine Individual |
Hanmer Springs Hanmer Springs 7360 |
16 Sep 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hood, Paul Andrew Individual |
Hanmer Springs Hanmer Springs 7360 |
16 Sep 2004 - current |
Ness, Simon Paul Individual |
South Island |
16 Sep 2004 - current |
Logan King Trustee Limited 1a Douglas Street |
|
Back Track Dairies Limited 1a Douglas Street |
|
Cn & Pm Sidwell Limited 1a Douglas Street |
|
Vgw Properties Limited 1a Douglas Street |
|
Tierracrece Limited 1a Douglas Street |
|
Fuller Dairy Limited 1a Douglas Street |