Owi Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429036204021) was started on 11 Dec 2002. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: 73 Waimahaka Fortification Road, Tokanui, 9875 (type: service, registered). 173 Spey Street, Invercargill had been their physical address, up until 01 Aug 2018. 1000 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 999 shares (99.9 per cent of shares), namely:
Stirling, Nigel William (an individual) located at Rd 5, Invercargill postcode 9875. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.1 per cent of all shares (exactly 1 share); it includes
Stirling, Karen Marie (an individual) - located at Rd 5, Invercargill. Businesscheck's data was updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
85 Gala Street, Queens Park, Invercargill, 9810 | Registered & physical & service | 01 Aug 2018 |
73 Waimahaka Fortification Road, Tokanui, 9875 | Service & registered | 29 Jun 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nigel William Stirling
Rd 5, Invercargill, 9875
Address used since 20 Aug 2013 |
Director | 11 Dec 2002 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Physical & registered | 28 Aug 2013 - 01 Aug 2018 |
Whk South, 173 Spey Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Registered & physical | 22 Jul 2011 - 28 Aug 2013 |
Whk South, 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill, 9810 | Registered & physical | 30 Aug 2010 - 22 Jul 2011 |
Whk, 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill 9810 | Registered & physical | 02 Sep 2009 - 30 Aug 2010 |
Whk Cook Adam Ward Wilson, 62 Deveron Street, Invercargill | Registered & physical | 04 Sep 2007 - 02 Sep 2009 |
C/ -whk Cook Adam, 181 Spey Street, Invercargill | Physical & registered | 12 Sep 2006 - 04 Sep 2007 |
C/- Cook Adam & Co., Chartered Accountants, 181 Spey Street, Invercargill | Physical & registered | 11 Dec 2002 - 12 Sep 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stirling, Nigel William Individual |
Rd 5 Invercargill 9875 |
11 Dec 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Stirling, Karen Marie Individual |
Rd 5 Invercargill 9875 |
11 Dec 2002 - current |
Schist Holdings Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
Northern Southland Engineering Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
Symonds Street Trust Services Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
Turntru Machining Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
N J Architectural Design Limited 173 Spey Street |
|
Ronaki (southland) Limited 173 Spey Street |