Murano Capital Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036225873) was incorporated on 09 Dec 2002. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 210 Victoria Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 (type: physical, registered). 204A Victoria Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 had been their registered address, up to 24 Jul 2015. 100 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Murano Trustee Company Limited (an entity) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050. The Businesscheck database was updated on 22 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
210 Victoria Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Physical & registered & service | 24 Jul 2015 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Grant Ashley Copland
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 24 Jul 2015 |
Director | 09 Dec 2002 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
204a Victoria Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & physical | 30 Oct 2009 - 24 Jul 2015 |
204a Victoria Avenue, Remuera, Auckland | Registered & physical | 06 Jun 2007 - 30 Oct 2009 |
93 Victoria Avenue, Remuera, Auckland | Registered & physical | 09 Dec 2002 - 06 Jun 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Murano Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429046501950 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
07 Dec 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Jaffe, Kevin Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
09 Dec 2002 - 07 Dec 2017 |
Copland, Tracy Lee Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
09 Dec 2002 - 10 Nov 2021 |
Copland, Grant Ashley Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
09 Dec 2002 - 10 Nov 2021 |
Copland, Tracy Lee Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
09 Dec 2002 - 10 Nov 2021 |
Copland, Grant Ashley Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
09 Dec 2002 - 10 Nov 2021 |
Macquarie Construction Limited 210 Victoria Avenue |
|
Llanddona Properties Limited 200a Victoria Avenue |
|
Langford Trust Co Limited 200a Victoria Avenue |
|
Chris Langford Trust Limited 200a Victoria Avenue |
|
Barlow Nominees Limited 204 Victoria Avenue |
|
Queen Charlotte Wines Limited 1 A Ingram Road |