Vrh Limited (issued a business number of 9429036285358) was registered on 12 Nov 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 2 Ely Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 (type: registered, physical). 2/11 Wootton Road, Remuera, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 08 Nov 2005. Vrh Limited used other aliases, namely: Villiers Road Holdings Limited from 24 Feb 2012 to 01 Apr 2021, Fitness Source New Zealand Limited (12 Nov 2002 to 24 Feb 2012). 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 2 entities and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Kang, Kok Wah (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050,
Bleakley, Paul Anthony Robert (an individual) located at Remuera, Auckland postcode 1050. "Business administrative service" (ANZSIC N729110) is the classification the ABS issued Vrh Limited. The Businesscheck database was updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
2 Ely Avenue, Remuera, Auckland, 1050 | Registered & physical & service | 08 Nov 2005 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paul Anthony Robert Bleakley
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 16 Feb 2010 |
Director | 12 Nov 2002 - current |
2 Ely Avenue , Remuera , Auckland , 1050 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
2/11 Wootton Road, Remuera, Auckland | Physical & registered | 12 Nov 2002 - 08 Nov 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kang, Kok Wah Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
29 Jan 2021 - current |
Bleakley, Paul Anthony Robert Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
12 Nov 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Bleakley, Robert Douglas Individual |
Rangatira Park Taupo 3330 |
25 Jul 2012 - 29 Jan 2021 |
Webboosting Limited 2 Ely Avenue |
|
Aaa Computer Services Limited Flat 1, 9 Wootton Road |
|
Fusion Culture Investment Limited 7a Wootton Road |
|
A2 Electrical Services Limited 14 Ely Avenue |
|
Julie M Hill Audiologist Limited 12 Ely Avenue |
|
Gateway Corporation Limited 22 Ely Avenue |
Swan Trustees Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
Dmg Trustees (zagalsky) Limited Level 3, 12 Kent Street |
Dmg Trustees (hamill) Limited Level 3, 12 Kent Street |
Dmg Trustees (2013) Limited Level 3, 12 Kent Street |
Dmg Trustees (bjerck) Limited Level 3, 12 Kent Street |
Dmg Trustees (2012) Limited Level 3, 12 Kent Street |