Ydl Investments Limited (issued a business number of 9429036294862) was started on 14 Oct 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 10 Woodland Avenue, Motueka, Motueka, 7120 (type: registered, physical). Level 11, Sovereign House, 34-42 Manners Street, Wellington 6011 had been their registered address, until 11 Feb 2011. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Hope, Yvonne Dorothy Lorraine (an individual) located at Motueka, Motueka postcode 7120. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Hope, Lawrence (an individual) - located at Motueka, Motueka. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 18 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
10 Woodland Avenue, Motueka, Motueka, 7120 | Registered & physical & service | 11 Feb 2011 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Yvonne Dorothy Lorraine Hope
Motueka, Motueka, 7120
Address used since 03 Feb 2011 |
Director | 30 Oct 2003 - current |
Lawrence Hope
Motueka, Motueka, 7120
Address used since 03 Feb 2011 |
Director | 15 Dec 2004 - current |
Dylan Hope
Kilbirnie, Wellington,
Address used since 20 Mar 2004 |
Director | 14 Oct 2002 - 15 Dec 2004 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 11, Sovereign House, 34-42 Manners Street, Wellington 6011 | Registered & physical | 15 Mar 2010 - 11 Feb 2011 |
Level 2, 354 Lambton Quay, Wellington | Registered & physical | 22 Dec 2004 - 15 Mar 2010 |
11 Countess Close, Maupuia, Wellington | Registered & physical | 14 Oct 2002 - 22 Dec 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hope, Yvonne Dorothy Lorraine Individual |
Motueka Motueka 7120 |
29 Apr 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hope, Lawrence Individual |
Motueka Motueka 7120 |
29 Apr 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hope, Dylan Individual |
Maupuia Wellington |
14 Oct 2002 - 15 Dec 2004 |
Hope, Lawrence Individual |
Maupuia Wellington |
14 Oct 2002 - 15 Dec 2004 |
Motueka Pistol Club Incorporated C/o Knapps Lawyers |
|
Motueka Branch Of The New Zealand Association Of Radio Transmitters Incorporated C/o J.s.f. Electronics |
|
Arthur Irwin Logan Limited Woodland Retirement Village |
|
Pathways Trust For Youth In Community 21 Hickmott Place |
|
Keep Motueka Beautiful Society Incorporated C/o Tasman District Council Serv Centre |
|
Bottle Stop Properties Limited 30 Naumai Street |