Promotional Contracting Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036317028) was launched on 26 Sep 2002. 5 addresess are currently in use by the company: P O Box 9008, Greerton, Tauranga, 3142 (type: postal, registered). 36H Macdonald Street, Mt Maunganui had been their physical address, until 07 May 2021. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Peat, Ruth Adelaide (a director) located at Tauranga postcode 3171. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Global Product Resources Limited (an entity) - located at Rd 3, Oropi. "Telemarketing - excluding goods sales and handling" (ANZSIC G431080) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Promotional Contracting Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 1, 74b Maleme Street, Greerton, Tauranga, 3112 | Office & delivery | 06 Sep 2020 |
Unit 1, 74b Maleme Street, Greerton, Tauranga, 3112 | Registered & physical & service | 07 May 2021 |
P O Box 9008, Greerton, Tauranga, 3142 | Postal | 04 Oct 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig Anthony Ivimey
Rd 3, Oropi, 3173
Address used since 04 Oct 2021
Rd 3, Tauranga, 0000
Address used since 01 Jan 2016 |
Director | 26 Sep 2002 - current |
Ruth Adelaide Peat
Tauranga, 3171
Address used since 24 Nov 2020 |
Director | 24 Nov 2020 - current |
Ross Neville Shadbolt
Rd 3, Tauranga, 3173
Address used since 26 Oct 2009 |
Director | 26 Sep 2002 - 24 Nov 2020 |
Unit 1, 74b Maleme Street , Greerton , Tauranga , 3112 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
36h Macdonald Street, Mt Maunganui | Physical & registered | 31 Jul 2007 - 07 May 2021 |
Level 3, 26 Mclean Street, Tauranga | Physical | 26 Sep 2002 - 31 Jul 2007 |
Paraonui Road, R D 1, Tokoroa | Registered | 26 Sep 2002 - 31 Jul 2007 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Peat, Ruth Adelaide Director |
Tauranga 3171 |
04 Oct 2021 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Global Product Resources Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037902254 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Rd 3 Oropi 3173 |
24 Jul 2007 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Shadbolt, Ross Neville Individual |
Pyes Pa Tauranga |
26 Sep 2002 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Ivimey, Craig Anthony Individual |
R D 1 Tokoroa |
26 Sep 2002 - 24 Jul 2007 |
Superlight Limited Unit 2 21 Macdonald Street |
|
Beach Express Limited Flat 2, 39 Ascot Road |
|
Physioworks Limited 35 Mcdonnell Street |
|
Medware Limited 50a Links Avenue |
|
Mcmillan & Lockwood Bop Limited 75 Aviation Avenue |
|
Artz Hair & Makeup Studio Limited 602 Maunganui Road |
Better Business Today Limited 191 Waihi Road |
Interseed NZ Limited 3 Garland Drive |
Bernau Distributors Limited 14 Ernest Kemp Rise |
Gupta Loans & Insurance Limited Flat 1, 379 Great South Road |
The Hub Consulting Limited 4/9 Commissariat Road |
Leads & Customers Limited 6/299 Sandringham Road |