Studio 8 Limited (issued a business number of 9429036366521) was launched on 15 Aug 2002. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 102 West End Road, Westmere, Auckland, 1022 (type: physical, registered). 100 West End Road, Westmere, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 07 May 2014. 100 shares are allotted to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 50 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Aitui, Matthew Laita (an individual) located at Westmere, Auckland postcode 1022. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (50 shares); it includes
Hohaia, Tamatha (an individual) - located at Westmere, Auckland. "Personal health and fitness trainer" (business classification S953950) is the classification the ABS issued to Studio 8 Limited. Businesscheck's database was last updated on 29 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
102 West End Road, Westmere, Auckland, 1022 | Physical & registered & service | 07 May 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Matthew Aitui
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 29 Apr 2014 |
Director | 15 Aug 2002 - current |
Tamatha Jane Hohaia
Westmere, Auckland, 1022
Address used since 01 Apr 2013 |
Director | 01 Apr 2013 - 30 Oct 2015 |
Tammy Aliitasi Mauala
Avondale,
Address used since 15 Aug 2002 |
Director | 15 Aug 2002 - 13 Oct 2004 |
102 West End Road , Westmere , Auckland , 1022 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
100 West End Road, Westmere, Auckland, 1022 | Physical & registered | 14 Dec 2010 - 07 May 2014 |
100a West End Road, Westmere, Auckland, 1022 | Registered | 04 Nov 2009 - 14 Dec 2010 |
142 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland | Physical | 31 Mar 2005 - 14 Dec 2010 |
142 Richmond Road, Grey Lynn, Auckland | Registered | 31 Mar 2005 - 04 Nov 2009 |
109 Holly Street, Avondale | Physical & registered | 15 Aug 2002 - 31 Mar 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Aitui, Matthew Laita Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
15 Aug 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hohaia, Tamatha Individual |
Westmere Auckland 1022 |
09 Sep 2015 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Mauala, Tammy Aliitasi Individual |
Avondale |
15 Aug 2002 - 22 Mar 2005 |
20 Twelve Limited 102 West End Road |
|
Mat.tam Limited 102 West End Road |
|
20 Fifteen Limited 102 West End Road |
|
Bodyfix Clinic Limited 100 West End Road |
|
Nzbodymechanic Limited 100a West End Road |
|
Lithian Management Limited 96 West End Road |
Gina Day Limited 25 William Denny Avenue |
Laughterworks Limited 35 Westmere Park Avenue |
Fit Therapies Limited 300 Richmond Road |
Walk And Talk Limited 300 Richmond Road |
Olga Horne Consulting Limited 1 Edwards Road |
Most Wanted Limited 12 Baildon Road |