Cjq.melida Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429036413317) was registered on 07 Aug 2002. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 156 Misa Road, Waiuku, Waiuku, 2682 (type: registered, physical). 19 Cockayne Crescent, Sunnynook, Auckland had been their registered address, until 17 Oct 2022. 100 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 99 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Quilty, Christopher Joseph (an individual) located at Sunnynook, Auckland postcode 0620. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Gampell, Melida Nickolaevna (an individual) - located at Rd 2, Albany. "Real estate management service" (ANZSIC L672050) is the classification the ABS issued to Cjq.melida Limited. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 06 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
156 Misa Road, Waiuku, Waiuku, 2682 | Registered & physical & service | 17 Oct 2022 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Christopher Joseph Quilty
Rd 2, Otaua, 2682
Address used since 06 Jul 2022
Sunnynook, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 20 Feb 2019
Rd 2, Albany, 0792
Address used since 21 Sep 2012 |
Director | 07 Aug 2002 - current |
Melida Nickolaevna Gampell
Rd 2, Albany, 0792
Address used since 21 Sep 2012 |
Director | 07 Aug 2002 - 19 Dec 2018 |
19 Cockayne Crescent , Sunnynook , Auckland , 0620 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
19 Cockayne Crescent, Sunnynook, Auckland, 0620 | Registered & physical | 17 Oct 2019 - 17 Oct 2022 |
410 Bawden Road, Rd 2, Albany, 0792 | Registered & physical | 01 Oct 2012 - 17 Oct 2019 |
410 Bawden Road, Rd2, Redvale, Albany, Auckland, 0792 | Physical & registered | 10 Sep 2010 - 01 Oct 2012 |
Gampell, Melida Nickolaevna, 410 Bawden Road, Rd2, Redvale, Albany | Registered & physical | 15 Sep 2008 - 10 Sep 2010 |
Lowthers Limited, Level 12 ,191 Queen Street, Auckland, 1050 | Physical & registered | 11 Mar 2008 - 15 Sep 2008 |
P J Dick & Company Ltd, 24 Veronica Street, New Lynn, Auckland | Physical & registered | 15 May 2007 - 11 Mar 2008 |
Gilligan & Company, Level 4, 2-6 Crowhurst Street, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 10 Jan 2007 - 15 May 2007 |
C/-gilligan & Company, Level 2, 3 Broadway, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 24 Nov 2005 - 10 Jan 2007 |
C/- Ascent Business Directions, Level 5, 145 Symonds Street, Auckland | Physical & registered | 07 Aug 2002 - 24 Nov 2005 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Quilty, Christopher Joseph Individual |
Sunnynook Auckland 0620 |
07 Aug 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gampell, Melida Nickolaevna Individual |
Rd 2 Albany 0792 |
07 Aug 2002 - current |
Carolina Trustee Limited 79 Wilson Road |
|
Shalini Investments Limited 7 Wilson Road |
|
One Shot Limited 350 Bawden Road |
|
Meerkat Plumbing And Drainage Limited 350 Bawden Road |
|
Ridgeview Homes Limited 29 Wilson Road |
|
Shec Investment Limited 404a Bawden Road |
Rbs One Limited 89 Lascelles Drive |
Arrow Property Management Limited 11 Corricvale Way |
V Station Limited 110 Awaruku Road |
Tayana Management Limited 124 Messenger Road |
New Synergies Limited 202 Kahikatea Flat Road |
Miro Holdings Limited 13 Glamorgan Drive |