Tapuae Limited (issued a business number of 9429036441921) was launched on 26 Jun 2002. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 53-55 Manchester Street, Feilding, 4702 (type: service, registered). 25 Princess Street, Palmerston North had been their physical address, up until 12 Feb 2016. 1000 shares are allocated to 6 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1 share (0.1% of shares), namely:
Gilbertson, Angus Christopher (an individual) located at R D 9, Feilding. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 25% of all shares (250 shares); it includes
Cooke, Dorothy Jane (an individual) - located at 89 Acacia Heights Drive, Taupo. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (240 shares, 24%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Carl, Helen Mary, located at Taupo (an individual). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 19 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
240 Ruahine Street, Roslyn, Palmerston North, 4414 | Physical & service & registered | 12 Feb 2016 |
53-55 Manchester Street, Feilding, 4702 | Service & registered | 25 Jul 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Dorothy Jane Cooke
89 Acacia Heights Drive, Taupo, 3377
Address used since 24 May 2016 |
Director | 26 Jun 2002 - current |
Helen Mary Carl
Taupo, 3377
Address used since 24 May 2016 |
Director | 26 Jun 2002 - current |
Angus Christopher Gilbertson
R D 9, Feilding, 4779
Address used since 24 May 2016 |
Director | 26 Jun 2002 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
25 Princess Street, Palmerston North | Physical & registered | 16 May 2008 - 12 Feb 2016 |
C/- Brumby Simpson Marshall Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 25 Princess Street, Palmerston North | Registered & physical | 26 Jun 2002 - 16 May 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gilbertson, Angus Christopher Individual |
R D 9 Feilding |
13 May 2008 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Cooke, Dorothy Jane Individual |
89 Acacia Heights Drive Taupo |
25 May 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Carl, Helen Mary Individual |
Taupo |
25 May 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lilburn, Hugh Alexander Individual |
Rd 2 Hunterville |
13 May 2008 - current |
Gilbertson, Angus Christopher Individual |
R D 9 Feilding |
26 Jun 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Gilbertson, Sarah Elizabeth Individual |
Rd 9 Feilding 4779 |
25 Jun 2019 - current |
Window Cleaning Plus Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
Valkyrie Games Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
3d Constructions Services Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
Nzr Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
John Turkington Machinery Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
Kay Consulting Limited 240 Ruahine Street |