Kahui Station Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429036613052) was registered on 18 Feb 2002. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 240 Ruahine Street, Roslyn, Palmerston North, 4414 (type: physical, registered). 25 Princess Street, Palmerston North had been their registered address, up until 27 Jan 2016. 1000 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 330 shares (33% of shares), namely:
Alley, Jenny Cecilia (an individual) located at Rd 3, Gisborne postcode 4073. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 33.5% of all shares (335 shares); it includes
Alley, Glenn Stuart (an individual) - located at Wainui, Gisborne. The 3rd group of shareholders, share allocation (335 shares, 33.5%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Alley, Ronald James, located at Inner Kaiti, Gisborne (an individual). Our information was last updated on 07 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
240 Ruahine Street, Roslyn, Palmerston North, 4414 | Physical & registered & service | 27 Jan 2016 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Glenn Stuart Alley
Wainui, Gisborne, 4073
Address used since 16 May 2023
Tiniroto Road, Gisborne, 4072
Address used since 25 Feb 2016 |
Director | 18 Feb 2002 - current |
Ronald James Alley
Inner Kaiti, Gisborne, 4010
Address used since 16 May 2023
Tiniroto Road, Gisborne, 4072
Address used since 25 Feb 2016 |
Director | 18 Feb 2002 - current |
Margaret Louise Alley
Tiniroto Road, Gisborne, 4072
Address used since 25 Feb 2016 |
Director | 18 Feb 2002 - 30 Mar 2019 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
25 Princess Street, Palmerston North | Registered & physical | 10 Feb 2010 - 27 Jan 2016 |
Brumby Simpson Partners, 25 Princess Street, Palmerston North | Registered & physical | 19 Feb 2008 - 10 Feb 2010 |
Brumby Simpson Marshall Limited, 25 Princess Street, Palmerston North | Registered & physical | 18 Feb 2002 - 19 Feb 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alley, Jenny Cecilia Individual |
Rd 3 Gisborne 4073 |
19 Sep 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alley, Glenn Stuart Individual |
Wainui Gisborne 4073 |
18 Feb 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alley, Ronald James Individual |
Inner Kaiti Gisborne 4010 |
18 Feb 2002 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Alley, Margaret Louise Individual |
Tiniroto Road Gisborne |
18 Feb 2002 - 12 Sep 2019 |
Window Cleaning Plus Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
Valkyrie Games Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
3d Constructions Services Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
Nzr Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
John Turkington Machinery Limited 240 Ruahine Street |
|
Kay Consulting Limited 240 Ruahine Street |