Boersen Farms Limited (NZBN 9429036688708) was registered on 07 Dec 2001. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 1 Princes Street, Paeroa, 3600 (type: registered, physical). 5 Princes Street, Paeroa had been their registered address, up until 23 Nov 2009. 1000 shares are allocated to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50% of shares), namely:
Boersen, Richard Anthony (an individual) located at Rd 1, Thames postcode 3578. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50% of all shares (500 shares); it includes
Boersen, Megan Christine (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Thames. Our information was last updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
1 Princes Street, Paeroa, 3600 | Registered & physical & service | 23 Nov 2009 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Richard Anthony Boersen
Rd 1, Thames, 3578
Address used since 06 Nov 2002 |
Director | 07 Dec 2001 - current |
Megan Christine Boersen
Rd 1, Thames, 3578
Address used since 06 Nov 2002 |
Director | 07 Dec 2001 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
5 Princes Street, Paeroa | Registered & physical | 26 Apr 2004 - 23 Nov 2009 |
25 Willoughby Street, Paeroa | Registered & physical | 07 Dec 2001 - 26 Apr 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Boersen, Richard Anthony Individual |
Rd 1 Thames 3578 |
07 Dec 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Boersen, Megan Christine Individual |
Rd 1 Thames 3578 |
07 Dec 2001 - current |
I.t.s. (no 105) Limited 1 Princes Street |
|
I.t.s. (no 104) Limited 1 Princes Street |
|
I.t.s. (no 102) Limited 1 Princes Street |
|
I.t.s. (no 101) Limited 1 Princes Street |
|
I.t.s. (no 103) Limited 1 Princes Street |
|
Clear View Dairy Farm Limited 1 Princes Street |