Engine Room Ca Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429036776887) was started on 06 Sep 2001. 3 addresses are currently in use by the company: 217 King Street, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 (type: office, physical). 217 King Street, Pukekohe had been their physical address, up until 05 Nov 2021. Engine Room Ca Limited used more aliases, namely: Diva Business Solutions Limited from 06 Sep 2001 to 11 Jun 2010. 10000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 10000 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
O'mara, Philippa Jane (an individual) located at Pukekohe. "Accounting service" (ANZSIC M693220) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Engine Room Ca Limited. Our database was last updated on 25 Jul 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
217 King Street, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 | Office | unknown |
217 King Street, Pukekohe, 2120 | Registered | 14 Jul 2010 |
217 King Street, Pukekohe, Pukekohe, 2120 | Physical & service | 05 Nov 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Philippa Jane O'mara
Pukekohe, Auckland, 2120
Address used since 01 Apr 2014 |
Director | 20 Apr 2007 - current |
Margaret Anne Holmes
Otumoetai, Tauranga, 3110
Address used since 15 Mar 2017 |
Director | 06 Sep 2001 - 26 Mar 2020 |
217 King Street , Pukekohe , Pukekohe , 2120 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
217 King Street, Pukekohe, 2120 | Physical | 14 Jul 2010 - 05 Nov 2021 |
1 Stembridge Avenue, Pukekohe | Registered & physical | 15 Feb 2005 - 14 Jul 2010 |
Mcconnell Holmes, Chartered Accountants, 11 A Massey Avenue, Pukekohe | Registered & physical | 13 Nov 2001 - 15 Feb 2005 |
66 King St, Puekeohe | Physical | 13 Nov 2001 - 13 Nov 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
O'mara, Philippa Jane Individual |
Pukekohe |
27 Oct 2006 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Webb, Malcolm Robert Individual |
Waiuku |
06 Sep 2001 - 27 Oct 2006 |
Holmes, Margaret Anne Individual |
Otumoetai Tauranga 3110 |
06 Sep 2001 - 26 Mar 2020 |
Silvia Trustees Limited 217 King Street |
|
Pukekohe South Doctors Limited 217 King Street |
|
Tuakau Learning Centre Limited 217 King Street |
|
Absolute Building Inspections Limited 217 King Street |
|
Tanekaha Block Limited 217 King Street |
|
Hvav Trustees Limited 217 King Street |
Magon Consultancies Limited 200 King Street |
Amsca Limited 188c Queen Street |
Eyespaw Limited Unit 29, 151 Kitchener Road |
Crossbeam New Zealand Limited 167d Runciman Road |
Mlh Business Services Limited 1446 Great South Road |
Rhijnsburg Bookkeepers Limited 131 Dominion Road |