Kiwifruit Investments 2001 Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429036990092) was incorporated on 07 Mar 2001. 5 addresess are in use by the company: 147 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, 3119 (type: office, delivery). 300 shares are allotted to 10 shareholders who belong to 6 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 3 entities and holds 97 shares (32.33% of shares), namely:
Buckton, Delwyn Josie (an individual) located at Rd 6, Pongakawa postcode 3186,
Buckton, Matthew Eric (an individual) located at Rd 6, Pongakawa postcode 3186,
Holland Beckett Trustee No.14 Limited (an entity) located at Tauranga, Tauranga postcode 3110. When considering the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 32.33% of all shares (exactly 97 shares); it includes
Fl Trustees 2017 Limited (an entity) - located at Te Puke,
Dowling, Shane Perry (an individual) - located at Rd 3, Te Puke,
Dowling, Michelle Ann (a director) - located at Rd 3, Te Puke. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (97 shares, 32.33%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Singh, Parmjit, located at Rd 6, Pongakawa (a director). "Kiwifruit growing" (business classification A013210) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Kiwifruit Investments 2001 Limited. Our information was updated on 14 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Cnr Queen & Oxford Streets, Te Puke | Registered & physical & service | 07 Mar 2001 |
P O Box 545, Te Puke, 3153 | Postal | 03 Oct 2019 |
147 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, 3119 | Office | 13 Oct 2020 |
147 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, Te Puke, 3119 | Delivery | 13 Oct 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Michelle Ann Dowling
Rd 3, Te Puke, 3183
Address used since 07 Aug 2017 |
Director | 07 Aug 2017 - current |
Parmjit Singh
Rd 6, Pongakawa, 3186
Address used since 07 Aug 2017 |
Director | 07 Aug 2017 - current |
Matthew Eric Buckton
Rd 6, Pongakawa, 3186
Address used since 05 Sep 2018 |
Director | 05 Sep 2018 - current |
Robert Roy Burt
Rd 3, Te Puke, 3183
Address used since 01 Aug 2017
Mount Maunganui, Mount Maunganui, 3116
Address used since 18 Oct 2013 |
Director | 07 Mar 2001 - 01 Jul 2020 |
Theo Leonard Struiksma
Rd 2, Te Puke, 3182
Address used since 01 Aug 2017
Papamoa Beach, Papamoa, 3118
Address used since 15 Oct 2015 |
Director | 07 Mar 2001 - 01 Jul 2020 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
147 Jellicoe Street, Te Puke, Te Puke, 3119 | Delivery | 13 Oct 2020 |
147 Jellicoe Street , Te Puke , 3119 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Buckton, Delwyn Josie Individual |
Rd 6 Pongakawa 3186 |
05 Sep 2018 - current |
Buckton, Matthew Eric Individual |
Rd 6 Pongakawa 3186 |
05 Sep 2018 - current |
Holland Beckett Trustee No.14 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429041065730 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Tauranga Tauranga 3110 |
05 Sep 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Fl Trustees 2017 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429045868368 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Te Puke 3187 |
11 Aug 2017 - current |
Dowling, Shane Perry Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
11 Aug 2017 - current |
Dowling, Michelle Ann Director |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
11 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Singh, Parmjit Director |
Rd 6 Pongakawa 3186 |
11 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Buckton, Matthew Eric Individual |
Rd 6 Pongakawa 3186 |
05 Sep 2018 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Singh, Parmjit Director |
Rd 6 Pongakawa 3186 |
11 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dowling, Michelle Ann Director |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
11 Aug 2017 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Underwood, Ross Ian Individual |
Rd 2 Te Puke 3182 |
07 Mar 2001 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Struiksma, Karen Dawn Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
13 Oct 2003 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Struiksma, Karen Dawn Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
13 Oct 2003 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Burt, Teresa Eloise Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
07 Mar 2001 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Struiksma, Theo Leonard Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
13 Oct 2003 - 11 Aug 2017 |
Underwood, Ross Ian Individual |
4 Motiti Road Papamoa 3118 |
07 Mar 2001 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Underwood, Ross Ian Individual |
4 Motiti Road Papamoa 3118 |
07 Mar 2001 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Struiksma, Karen Dawn Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
13 Oct 2003 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Struiksma, Karen Dawn Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
13 Oct 2003 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Struiksma, Karen Dawn Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
13 Oct 2003 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Burt, Robert Roy Individual |
119a Muricata Avenue Mount Maunganui 3116 |
07 Mar 2001 - 11 Aug 2017 |
Struiksma, Theo Leonard Individual |
Rd 2 Te Puke 3182 |
11 Aug 2017 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Fl Trustees 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042102717 Company Number: 5862007 Entity |
Te Puke 3187 |
11 Aug 2017 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Struiksma, Theo Leonard Individual |
Rd 2 Te Puke 3182 |
11 Aug 2017 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Struiksma, Theo Leonard Individual |
Rd 2 Te Puke 3182 |
11 Aug 2017 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Fl Trustees 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042102717 Company Number: 5862007 Entity |
Te Puke 3187 |
11 Aug 2017 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Underwood, Ross Ian Individual |
Rd 2 Te Puke 3182 |
07 Mar 2001 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Burt, Teresa Eloise Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
07 Mar 2001 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Burt, Teresa Eloise Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
07 Mar 2001 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Burt, Teresa Eloise Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
07 Mar 2001 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Burt, Robert Roy Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
11 Aug 2017 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Burt, Robert Roy Individual |
Rd 3 Te Puke 3183 |
11 Aug 2017 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Fl Trustees 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042102717 Company Number: 5862007 Entity |
Te Puke 3187 |
11 Aug 2017 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Fl Trustees 2016 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429042102717 Company Number: 5862007 Entity |
Te Puke 3187 |
11 Aug 2017 - 04 Oct 2021 |
Underwood, Ross Ian Individual |
4 Motiti Road Papamoa 3118 |
07 Mar 2001 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Struiksma, Karen Dawn Individual |
Papamoa Beach Papamoa 3118 |
13 Oct 2003 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Underwood, Ross Ian Individual |
Rd 2 Te Puke 3182 |
07 Mar 2001 - 01 Nov 2022 |
Fl Trustees 2013 Limited Cnr Queen & Oxford Streets |
|
Fltbwh Limited Cnr Queen & Oxford Streets |
|
Pitau Holdings Limited Corner Queen And Oxford Streets |
|
Thomac Holdings Limited Cnr Queen Street & Oxford Street |
|
Ollywood Kiwi Limited Corner Queen & Oxford Streets |
|
Stoney Acres Limited Corner Queen & Oxford Streets |
Weskco Limited 49 Jellicoe Street |
Bay Orchards Limited 8 Queen Street |
Strathkiwi Limited 8 Queen Street |
Ksl Services Limited 153 Jellicoe Street |
Dhillonsg Enterprises Limited 21 Gilmore Street |
Js & R Trading Limited 169 Cameron Road |