Lorikeet Holdings Limited (NZBN 9429036993802) was started on 28 Feb 2001. 9 addresess are in use by the company: 4 Parry Palm Avenue, Waihi, Bay Of Plenty, 3610 (type: physical, service). 4 Parry Palm Avenue, Waihi, Waihi had been their physical address, up until 12 Aug 2020. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Slatter, Keith Wilfred (an individual) located at Waihi, Waihi postcode 3610. "Delivery service - road" (ANZSIC I461010) is the classification the ABS issued Lorikeet Holdings Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 10 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
4 Parry Palm Avenue, Waihi, Waihi, 3610 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 02 Aug 2016 |
4 Parry Palm Avenue, Waihi, Bay Of Plenty, 3610 | Office & postal & delivery & invoice & other (Address For Share Register) & shareregister | 04 Aug 2020 |
4 Parry Palm Avenue, Waihi, Bay Of Plenty, 3610 | Physical & service & registered | 12 Aug 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Keith Wilfred Slatter
Waihi, Bay Of Plenty, 3610
Address used since 05 Aug 2018
Waihi, Waihi, 3610
Address used since 02 Aug 2016 |
Director | 28 Feb 2001 - current |
Melissa Donna Slatter
Livingstone, Hamilton, 3200
Address used since 04 Sep 2015 |
Director | 25 Aug 2015 - 05 Aug 2018 |
4 Parry Palm Avenue , Waihi , Bay Of Plenty , 3610 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4 Parry Palm Avenue, Waihi, Waihi, 3610 | Physical & registered | 10 Aug 2016 - 12 Aug 2020 |
61 Seddon Avenue, Waihi, 3610 | Physical & registered | 20 Dec 2006 - 10 Aug 2016 |
395 A Huia Road, Titirangi, Auckland | Physical & registered | 28 Feb 2001 - 20 Dec 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Slatter, Keith Wilfred Individual |
Waihi Waihi 3610 |
28 Feb 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Haynes, Louise Mcdonald Individual |
Waihi Bay Of Plenty 3610 |
09 May 2017 - 20 Feb 2019 |
Slatter, Lorraine Alana Individual |
Waihi |
28 Feb 2001 - 29 Sep 2015 |
Haynes, Louise Mcdonald Individual |
Waihi Bay Of Plenty 3610 |
09 May 2017 - 20 Feb 2019 |
K2 NZ Lifestyle Limited 30 Mackay Street |
|
J A Orchard Accountant Limited 30 Mackay Street |
|
Rubik Holdings Limited 19a Kenny Street |
|
Dj Decorating Limited 29 Mackay Street |
|
Asaphandy Limited 24 Kenny Street |
|
Waihi Health Trust C/o Waihi Health Centre |
Jellicoe Trading Limited 405 Mackay Street |
Valley Road Freight Limited 723 Pollen Street |
C & L Transport Limited 95 Devonport Road |
A 1 Carriers Bay Of Plenty Limited 52 Oreti Crescent |
Boyte Trucking Limited 29 Rainey Crescent |
Kesaw Enterprises Limited 72 Ryburn Road |