Head Investments Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429037013875) was registered on 14 Feb 2001. 6 addresess are in use by the company: 56 Awatere Avenue, Beerescourt, Hamilton, 3200 (type: registered, physical). 3 September Grove, Rd 3, Hamilton had been their registered address, up to 20 Sep 2021. 1000 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Head, Karen Lee (an individual) located at Rd 3, Hamilton postcode 3283. Businesscheck's data was last updated on 03 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
210 Wallace Rd., R.d. 9, Hamilton | Records & other (Address for Records) | 22 Feb 2006 |
26 Bond St, Hamilton | Other (Address For Share Register) | 14 Apr 2009 |
3 September Grove, Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 | Other (Address For Share Register) | 12 Mar 2019 |
56 Awatere Avenue, Beerescourt, Hamilton, 3200 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Sep 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Karen Lee Head
Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283
Address used since 12 Mar 2019
Hamilton East, Hamilton, 3216
Address used since 01 Jul 2016 |
Director | 14 Feb 2001 - current |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
56 Awatere Avenue, Beerescourt, Hamilton, 3200 | Registered & physical & service | 20 Sep 2021 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
3 September Grove, Rd 3, Hamilton, 3283 | Registered | 20 Mar 2019 - 20 Sep 2021 |
26 Bond St, Hamilton | Registered | 21 Apr 2009 - 20 Mar 2019 |
210 Wallace Road, Rd 9, Hamilton, 3289 | Physical | 01 Mar 2006 - 20 Sep 2021 |
10 Church Rd., Hamilton | Registered | 01 Mar 2006 - 21 Apr 2009 |
3a Haast St., Auckland | Registered & physical | 02 Mar 2005 - 01 Mar 2006 |
Staples Rodway Ltd, 11th Floor, Tower Centre, 45 Queen Street, Auckland | Registered & physical | 07 Mar 2003 - 02 Mar 2005 |
35 Walters Road, Mt Eden, Auckland | Registered | 25 Feb 2002 - 07 Mar 2003 |
35 Walters Road, Mt Eden, Auckland | Physical | 22 Feb 2002 - 07 Mar 2003 |
Level 8, Westpactrust Tower, 120 Albert Street, Auckland | Registered | 14 Feb 2001 - 25 Feb 2002 |
Level 8, Westpactrust Tower, 120 Albert Street, Auckland | Physical | 14 Feb 2001 - 22 Feb 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Head, Karen Lee Individual |
Rd 3 Hamilton 3283 |
14 Feb 2001 - current |
Mahi Ngatahi Downs Limited 27 Bond Street |
|
Koretz Trustee Limited 23 Bond Street |
|
Admin Pro Limited 2 James Street |
|
Prestigious Princes Wharf Limited 3 Armagh Street |
|
John Macewan Building Limited 4 Armagh Street |
|
Carefree Tours (nz) Limited 1a James Street |