Tim Miller Contracting Limited (issued a business number of 9429037015138) was launched on 08 Feb 2001. 2 addresses are in use by the company: 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, Richmond, 7020 (type: registered, physical). Crowe Horwath Richmond, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson had been their physical address, up until 25 Jun 2019. 100 shares are allocated to 5 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 3 entities and holds 98 shares (98 per cent of shares), namely:
Maitai Trustee Company No. 23 Limited (an entity) located at Richmond, Richmond postcode 7020,
Miller, Anne Patricia (an individual) located at Stoke, Nelson,
Miller, Timothy Hugh Cameron (an individual) located at Stoke, Nelson. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1 per cent of all shares (1 share); it includes
Miller, Timothy Hugh Cameron (an individual) - located at Stoke, Nelson. Moving on to the third group of shareholders, share allotment (1 share, 1%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Miller, Anne Patricia, located at Stoke, Nelson (an individual). Businesscheck's database was last updated on 02 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
20 Oxford Street, Richmond, Richmond, 7020 | Registered & physical & service | 25 Jun 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Timothy Hugh Cameron Miller
Stoke, Nelson, 7011
Address used since 08 Feb 2001 |
Director | 08 Feb 2001 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Crowe Horwath Richmond, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson, 7020 | Physical & registered | 02 Jul 2014 - 25 Jun 2019 |
Whk Richmond, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson, 7020 | Registered & physical | 24 Jun 2011 - 02 Jul 2014 |
Hintons Limited Chartered Accountants, 20 Oxford Street, Richmond, Nelson | Registered & physical | 15 Feb 2006 - 24 Jun 2011 |
Hinton & Assoc, Chartered Accountants, 2nd Floor, Tasman Energy Bldg, 281 Queen Street, Richmond, Nelson | Physical & registered | 08 Feb 2001 - 15 Feb 2006 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Maitai Trustee Company No. 23 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429032334593 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Richmond Richmond 7020 |
06 May 2011 - current |
Miller, Anne Patricia Individual |
Stoke Nelson |
08 Sep 2004 - current |
Miller, Timothy Hugh Cameron Individual |
Stoke Nelson |
08 Sep 2004 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Timothy Hugh Cameron Individual |
Stoke Nelson |
08 Feb 2001 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Anne Patricia Individual |
Stoke Nelson |
16 Jun 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Hinton, Alan Keith Individual |
Richmond Nelson |
08 Sep 2004 - 06 May 2011 |
Ground Anchor Systems Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Adcock Properties Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Orauea Farm Management Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Selbourne Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Fried Eggs On Toast Limited 20 Oxford Street |
|
Clements Windows And Doors Limited 20 Oxford Street |