Lgl Fish Holdings Limited (issued an NZ business number of 9429037076474) was launched on 04 Dec 2000. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 36A Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 (type: physical, registered). Unit 3, 21 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch had been their registered address, up until 03 Jan 2019. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 3 shareholder groups. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 1 share (1 per cent of shares), namely:
Lanauze, Nadine (an individual) located at Pitt Island, Chatham Islands. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 49 per cent of all shares (49 shares); it includes
Lanauze, Lenard Gregory (an individual) - located at Pitt Island, Chatham Islands. Next there is the third group of shareholders, share allocation (50 shares, 50%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Lanauze, Lenard Gregory & Edward Patrick, located at Pitt Island, Chatham Islands (an individual). Our data was last updated on 16 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
36a Sir William Pickering Drive, Burnside, Christchurch, 8053 | Physical & registered & service | 03 Jan 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Lenard Gregory Lanauze
Chatham Islands, 8942
Address used since 28 Jul 2015 |
Director | 04 Dec 2000 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 3, 21 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Registered & physical | 30 Jun 2014 - 03 Jan 2019 |
21 Birmingham Drive, Middleton, Christchurch, 8024 | Physical & registered | 04 Jul 2012 - 30 Jun 2014 |
C/- Brian Soutar & Associates, Chartered, Accountants, 10th Floor, Bnz Bldg, 137 Armagh Str, Christchurch | Registered & physical | 04 Dec 2000 - 04 Jul 2012 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lanauze, Nadine Individual |
Pitt Island Chatham Islands |
04 Dec 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lanauze, Lenard Gregory Individual |
Pitt Island Chatham Islands |
04 Dec 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Lanauze, Lenard Gregory & Edward Patrick Individual |
Pitt Island Chatham Islands |
04 Dec 2000 - current |
Graeme Jacobs Architect Limited Unit 3, 21 Birmingham Drive |
|
Lancar Industries Limited 23 C Birmingham Drive |
|
Industrial Training Centre Limited 23c Birmingham Drive |
|
NZ Bizworks Limited 23f Birmingham Drive |
|
Mainland Electrical Limited 23f Birmingham Drive |
|
Banks Peninsula Conservation Trust 18a Birmingham Drive |