Sharjo Holdings Limited (New Zealand Business Number 9429037129026) was registered on 22 Sep 2000. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 33 Coles Crescent, Papakura, 2110 (type: physical, service). Robertson Bixley Ltd, Cnr East & Wood Streets, Papakura 2110 had been their registered address, up until 29 Aug 2008. 1200 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group is composed of 1 entity and holds 1198 shares (99.83% of shares), namely:
Forbes, Paulette Carran (an individual) located at Rd 3, Silverdale postcode 0993. When considering the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 0.17% of all shares (exactly 2 shares); it includes
Estate Of John Forbes (an other) - located at Rd 3, Silverdale. "Waste disposal service" (business classification D292140) is the category the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued to Sharjo Holdings Limited. Our data was updated on 08 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
33 Coles Crescent, Papakura, 2110 | Registered | 29 Aug 2008 |
33 Coles Crescent, Papakura, 2110 | Physical & service | 29 Sep 2008 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Paulette Carran Forbes
Rd 3, Silverdale, 0993
Address used since 06 Jul 2023 |
Director | 06 Jul 2023 - current |
John Forbes
Rd 2, Drury, 2578
Address used since 01 Mar 2015 |
Director | 22 Sep 2000 - 06 Jul 2023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Robertson Bixley Ltd, Cnr East & Wood Streets, Papakura 2110 | Registered | 07 Apr 2008 - 29 Aug 2008 |
Robertson Bixley Ltd, Cnr East & Wood Streets, Papakura 2110 | Physical | 07 Apr 2008 - 29 Sep 2008 |
Robertson Bixley & Assoc, Chartered Accountants, Cnr East & Wood Sts, Papakura | Registered & physical | 22 Sep 2000 - 07 Apr 2008 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Forbes, Paulette Carran Individual |
Rd 3 Silverdale 0993 |
11 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Estate Of John Forbes Other (Other) |
Rd 3 Silverdale 0993 |
11 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Forbes, John Individual |
Rd 2 Drury 2578 |
22 Sep 2000 - 11 Jul 2023 |
Forbes, John Individual |
Rd 2 Drury 2578 |
22 Sep 2000 - 11 Jul 2023 |
Forbes, Sharyn Joy Individual |
R D 2 Drury |
22 Sep 2000 - 14 Mar 2014 |
Forbes, Sharyn Joy Individual |
R D 2 Drury |
22 Sep 2000 - 14 Mar 2014 |
Gellerts Limited 33 Coles Crescent |
|
N P Baker Limited 33 Coles Crescent |
|
Gft Trustee Limited 33 Coles Crescent |
|
Cowen Trading Limited 33 Coles Crescent |
|
NZ Homes Limited 33 Coles Crescent |
|
Cougar Engineering Limited 33 Coles Crescent |
Counties Bins (2004) Limited 76 Sykes Road |
Riley Transport Limited 6 Chapletown Drive |
Residual Waste Limited 222 Station Road |
A R Dale & N Brunschwiler Limited 7a The Way |
Onetangi Waste & Water Systems Limited Unit G-12, 23 Edwin Street |
Just Bins 2017 Limited Level 1, 46 Stanley Street, Parnell |