Millers Coffee Limited (NZBN 9429037208653) was registered on 18 Jul 2000. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 (type: registered, service). Unit 19 Building 5, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland had been their physical address, up until 12 Oct 2017. 500 shares are issued to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (100% of shares), namely:
Miller, Craig William (an individual) located at Newton, Auckland. Our database was updated on 23 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
46 Sale Street, Cockle Bay, Auckland, 2014 | Physical & service & registered | 12 Oct 2017 |
Level 2, 24 Augustus Terrace, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & service | 05 Jul 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig William Miller
Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010
Address used since 08 Oct 2009 |
Director | 18 Jul 2000 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Unit 19 Building 5, 15 Accent Drive, East Tamaki, Auckland | Physical & registered | 06 May 2005 - 12 Oct 2017 |
20b Rylock Place, Pakuranga, Aucland | Registered | 02 Mar 2001 - 06 May 2005 |
178 Kolmar Road, Hunters Corner, Papatoetoe, Auckland | Physical | 02 Mar 2001 - 06 May 2005 |
20b Rylock Place, Pakuranga, Aucland | Physical | 02 Mar 2001 - 02 Mar 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Miller, Craig William Individual |
Newton Auckland |
18 Jul 2000 - current |
Mo's On Federal Limited 46 Sale Street |
|
National Concrete Pumps Limited 46 Sale Street |
|
Aps Tooling Limited 46 Sale Street |
|
Quality Matters Limited 46 Sale Street |
|
Roger Ransom Trust Limited 46 Sale Street |
|
Planit Design Limited 46 Sale Street |