Thedao.agency Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037330064) was incorporated on 14 Mar 2000. 4 addresses are in use by the company: Unit 1, 27 The Rigi, Northland, Wellington, 6012 (type: physical, service). 115 Tory Street, Te Aro, Wellington had been their registered address, until 09 Sep 2019. Thedao.agency Limited used more aliases, namely: 3Months.com Limited from 14 Mar 2000 to 10 Nov 2022. 100 shares are allotted to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Pascall, Mark Sommerville (an individual) located at Northland, Wellington postcode 6012. "Software development service nec" (ANZSIC M700050) is the classification the Australian Bureau of Statistics issued Thedao.agency Limited. The Businesscheck information was updated on 17 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Unit 1, 27 The Rigi, Northland, Wellington, 6012 | Postal & office | 30 Aug 2019 |
Unit 1, 27 The Rigi, Northland, Wellington, 6012 | Physical & service & registered | 09 Sep 2019 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Mark Pascall
Northland, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 30 Aug 2019
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 04 May 2007 |
Director | 14 Mar 2000 - current |
Paul Caleb Salisbury
Beachlands, Auckland, 2018
Address used since 25 Jul 2018
Titirangi, Auckland, 0604
Address used since 01 Apr 2017 |
Director | 01 Apr 2017 - 30 Aug 2019 |
Ruth Pascall
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 04 May 2007 |
Director | 06 Oct 2004 - 01 Apr 2017 |
115 Tory Street , Te Aro , Wellington , 6011 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
115 Tory Street, Te Aro, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 17 Aug 2016 - 09 Sep 2019 |
83 Campbell Street, Karori, Wellington, 6012 | Physical | 11 May 2007 - 09 Sep 2019 |
101-103 Courtenay Place, Wellington | Registered | 22 Oct 2004 - 17 Aug 2016 |
64 Heke St, Ngaio, Wellington | Physical | 23 Jul 2004 - 11 May 2007 |
64 Heke Street, Ngaio, Wellington | Registered | 18 May 2004 - 22 Oct 2004 |
27 Alexandra Rd, Roseneath, Wellington | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 18 May 2004 |
27 Alexandra Rd, Roseneath, Wellington | Physical | 14 Mar 2000 - 23 Jul 2004 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pascall, Mark Sommerville Individual |
Northland Wellington 6012 |
26 Oct 2005 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Pascall, Ruth Individual |
Karori Wellington |
29 Sep 2004 - 21 Mar 2018 |
Salisbury, Paul Caleb Individual |
Beachlands Auckland 2018 |
03 Apr 2017 - 20 May 2019 |
Leong, David Individual |
Kilbirnie Wellington |
26 Oct 2005 - 30 Aug 2021 |
Pascall, Mark Individual |
Karori Wellington |
14 Mar 2000 - 30 Aug 2019 |
Leong, David Individual |
Kilbirnie Wellington |
26 Oct 2005 - 30 Aug 2021 |
Leong, David Individual |
Kilbirnie Wellington |
26 Oct 2005 - 30 Aug 2021 |
Pascall, Ruth Anne Individual |
Karori , Wellington |
26 Oct 2005 - 21 Mar 2018 |
Young Women's Christian Association Of Aotearoa New Zealand Incorporated The Biz Dojo |
|
The Tedxwellington Charitable Group Board Biz Dojo |
|
Kowtow Clothing Limited 113 Tory Street |
|
Lisa's Hair & Nail Limited 42 Vivian Street |
|
Smart Hr Limited Apartment 405 38 Jessie Street |
|
Environment Hubs Aotearoa Incorporated Dowse Murray Chartered Accountants |
Loomio Limited Level 2, 275 Cuba Street |
Rubber Monkey Software Limited Level 3, 175 Victoria St |
Quantate Limited 1/20 Egmont Street |
Haunt Digital Limited 40 Taranaki Street |
Chromacode Limited 1a/164 Vivian St |
Laucode Interactive Limited 36/29 Webb Street |