Mgi Auckland Assurance Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429037352103) was launched on 09 Mar 2000. 8 addresess are currently in use by the company: Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: office, registered). 14A York Street, Parnell, Auckland had been their registered address, up until 10 Oct 2023. Mgi Auckland Assurance Limited used more aliases, namely: Mgi Auckland Limited from 23 May 2008 to 05 Oct 2022, Mgi Wilson Eliott Limited (09 Mar 2000 to 23 May 2008). 100000 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 4 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 30000 shares (30% of shares), namely:
Darshini Singh Trustees Limited (an entity) located at Totara Heights, Auckland postcode 2105. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 30% of all shares (30000 shares); it includes
Sts 06 Limited (an entity) - located at Auckland. The next group of shareholders, share allotment (30000 shares, 30%) belongs to 2 entities, namely:
Roberton, Michael Andrew, located at Remuera, Auckland (an individual),
Francis, Nicholas George, located at Remuera, Auckland (an individual). "Accountant" (ANZSIC M693210) is the category the ABS issued to Mgi Auckland Assurance Limited. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 20 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Office | unknown |
14a York Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Physical | 12 Oct 2022 |
Level 5,32-34 Mahuhu Cresent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 10 Oct 2023 |
Level 5,32-34 Mahuhu Cresent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Postal & office & delivery | 20 Feb 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Nicholas George Francis
Remuera, Auckland, 1050
Address used since 26 Jan 2011 |
Director | 09 Mar 2000 - current |
Jill Louise Howard
Castor Bay, Auckland, 0620
Address used since 21 Jan 2020
361 Paremoremo Road, Paremoremo, North Shore City, 0632
Address used since 29 Oct 2009 |
Director | 01 Apr 2008 - current |
Darshini Singh
Flat Bush, Auckland, 2019
Address used since 07 Sep 2022 |
Director | 07 Sep 2022 - current |
Rachel Leigh Easton
Grey Lynn, Auckland, 1021
Address used since 01 Jun 2016 |
Director | 01 Jun 2016 - 31 Mar 2022 |
Douglas John Wilson
Epsom, Auckland, 1051
Address used since 09 Mar 2000 |
Director | 09 Mar 2000 - 01 Apr 2012 |
John Stanley Alexander
Mount Eden, Auckland, 1024
Address used since 29 Oct 2009 |
Director | 25 Aug 2009 - 15 Apr 2011 |
Peter Webster Wilson
Epsom, Auckland,
Address used since 09 Mar 2000 |
Director | 09 Mar 2000 - 04 Mar 2004 |
Type | Used since | |
---|---|---|
Level 5,32-34 Mahuhu Crescent, Auckland Central, Auckland, 1010 | Registered & service | 28 Feb 2024 |
Level 2, Fidelity House , 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket , Auckland , 1023 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
14a York Street, Parnell, Auckland, 1052 | Registered & service | 12 Oct 2022 - 10 Oct 2023 |
Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 29 Sep 2016 - 12 Oct 2022 |
Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Rd, Newmarket, Auckland | Registered & physical | 31 Oct 2008 - 29 Sep 2016 |
C/- Mgi Wilson Eliott Limited, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket | Registered | 07 Mar 2002 - 31 Oct 2008 |
Mgi Wilson Eliott, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 07 Mar 2002 |
Mgi Wilson Eliott, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket | Physical | 09 Mar 2000 - 31 Oct 2008 |
C/- Mgi Wilson Eliott Limited, Level 2, Fidelity House, 81 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket | Physical | 09 Mar 2000 - 09 Mar 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Darshini Singh Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429048788427 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Totara Heights Auckland 2105 |
04 Apr 2022 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Sts 06 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034298237 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland 1010 |
29 Oct 2009 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Roberton, Michael Andrew Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
29 Oct 2009 - current |
Francis, Nicholas George Individual |
Remuera Auckland 1050 |
09 Mar 2000 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Kapuka Capital Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429047903074 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Auckland Central Auckland 1010 |
20 Sep 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Howard, Jill Louise Individual |
Albany Auckland |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 |
Howard, Jill Louise Individual |
Albany Auckland |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 |
Easton, Bryan Martin Individual |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 |
10 Jun 2016 - 04 Apr 2022 |
Wilson, Douglas John Individual |
Epsom Auckland |
09 Mar 2000 - 29 Jun 2012 |
Jackson Russell Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036501915 Company Number: 1209566 Entity |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 | |
Mgi Wilson Eliott Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038243424 Company Number: 825392 Entity |
23 Oct 2008 - 23 Oct 2008 | |
Easton, Rachel Leigh Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
10 Jun 2016 - 04 Apr 2022 |
Howard, Jill Louise Individual |
Albany Auckland |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 |
Howard, Jill Louise Individual |
Castor Bay Auckland 0620 |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 |
Mgi Wilson Eliott Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038243424 Company Number: 825392 Entity |
23 Oct 2008 - 23 Oct 2008 | |
Roberton, Michael Andrew Individual |
Parnell Auckland |
09 Mar 2000 - 27 Nov 2006 |
Smart, Darren Keith Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
10 Jun 2016 - 04 Apr 2022 |
Smart, Darren Keith Individual |
Grey Lynn Auckland 1021 |
10 Jun 2016 - 04 Apr 2022 |
Easton, Bryan Martin Individual |
Silverdale Silverdale 0932 |
10 Jun 2016 - 04 Apr 2022 |
Newmarket Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037884192 Company Number: 900433 Entity |
29 Oct 2009 - 05 May 2011 | |
Van Leuven, Stephanie Jane Individual |
Epsom Auckland |
23 Oct 2008 - 23 Oct 2008 |
Walker, Gregory Thomas Individual |
Epsom Auckland |
23 Oct 2008 - 23 Oct 2008 |
Alexander, John Stanley Individual |
Mt Eden Auckland |
29 Oct 2009 - 05 May 2011 |
Howard, Jill Louise Individual |
Albany Auckland |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 |
Jackson Russell Trustee Services Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429036501915 Company Number: 1209566 Entity |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 | |
Whale, Robert Barry Individual |
Epsom Auckland |
09 Mar 2000 - 29 Jun 2012 |
Howard, Bryce Eric Individual |
Paremoremo Auckland 0632 |
09 Mar 2000 - 20 Sep 2019 |
Howard, Jill Louise Individual |
Paremoremo Auckland 0632 |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 |
Howard, Jill Louise Individual |
Albany Auckland |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 |
Sts 06 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034298237 Company Number: 1769501 Entity |
27 Nov 2006 - 27 Nov 2006 | |
Howard, Bryce Eric Individual |
Paremoremo Auckland 0632 |
09 Mar 2000 - 20 Sep 2019 |
Newmarket Trustees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429037884192 Company Number: 900433 Entity |
29 Oct 2009 - 05 May 2011 | |
Sts 06 Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429034298237 Company Number: 1769501 Entity |
27 Nov 2006 - 27 Nov 2006 | |
Howard, Jill Louise Individual |
Castor Bay Auckland 0620 |
09 Mar 2000 - 07 Oct 2005 |
Incisive Limited Level , Fidelity House |
|
S.e Robinson Limited Level 2, Fidelity House |
|
Erobinson Limited Level 2, Fidelity House |
|
Parker Corp. Global Aspirations Limited Level 2, Fidelity House |
|
Bhimjiyanis Limited Level 2, Fidelity House |
|
Paradice Ice Skating (2013) Limited Level 2, Fidelity House |
Cogitare Limited 101/8 Middleton Road |
T J & P M Kennard Limited 707/135 Grafton Road |
Harrop & Co Limited 135 Grafton Rd, Grafton |
Snow & Associates Limited 32 Seaview Road |
Childs Accounting Limited 18 St.marks Road |
Auckland Taxaction Limited 111 Newton Road |