Lee Processors Limited (NZBN 9429037420017) was registered on 29 Nov 1999. 2 addresses are currently in use by the company: 35 Valhalla Drive, Richmond, 7020 (type: registered, physical). 35 Valhalla Drive, Richmond, Richmond had been their registered address, until 20 May 2021. Lee Processors Limited used other aliases, namely: P & M Projects 2 Limited from 29 Nov 1999 to 17 May 2000. 100 shares are allocated to 1 shareholder who belongs to 1 shareholder group. The first group contains 1 entity and holds 100 shares (100 per cent of shares), namely:
Irvine, David Leigh (an individual) located at Richmond, Richmond postcode 7020. The Businesscheck information was last updated on 30 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
35 Valhalla Drive, Richmond, Richmond, 7020 | Service & physical | 06 Jun 2019 |
35 Valhalla Drive, Richmond, 7020 | Registered | 20 May 2021 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
David Leigh Irvine
Richmond, 7020
Address used since 12 May 2021
Rd 1, Brightwater, 7091
Address used since 18 May 2010
Richmond, Richmond, 7020
Address used since 28 May 2019 |
Director | 28 Mar 2000 - current |
Dennis Edward Creed
Nelson,
Address used since 29 Nov 1999 |
Director | 29 Nov 1999 - 28 Mar 2000 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
35 Valhalla Drive, Richmond, Richmond, 7020 | Registered | 06 Jun 2019 - 20 May 2021 |
2 Fullford Drive, Richmond, Nelson, 7020 | Registered & physical | 26 May 2015 - 06 Jun 2019 |
C/- P W Sutherland, 2 Stansell Avenue, Nelson, 7011 | Physical & registered | 26 May 2014 - 26 May 2015 |
C/- P W Sutherland, Sanford Buildings, 137 Victoria St, Nelson | Physical | 29 May 2001 - 29 May 2001 |
C/- P W Sutherland, Sanford Building, 137 Vickerman St, Nelson | Registered | 24 May 2000 - 26 May 2014 |
Sanford Building, 137 Vickerman Street, Nelson | Registered | 24 May 2000 - 24 May 2000 |
Sanford Building, 137 Vickerman Street, Nelson | Physical | 24 May 2000 - 29 May 2001 |
78 Selwyn Place, Nelson | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 24 May 2000 |
78 Selwyn Place, Nelson | Physical | 07 Apr 2000 - 24 May 2000 |
78 Selwyn Place, Nelson | Registered | 07 Apr 2000 - 12 Apr 2000 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Irvine, David Leigh Individual |
Richmond Richmond 7020 |
29 Nov 1999 - current |
Scotty's Auto Shop Limited 2 Fullford Drive |
|
Lee Forests Limited 2 Fullford Drive |
|
Qbis Limited C/-g Slappendel |
|
Smft Trustee Limited 14 John Sutton Place |
|
Best Price Technology Limited 21 John Sutton Place |
|
Augmentum Capital Limited 4 Childs Way |