Dawson Farms Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037422189) was started on 03 Dec 1999. 2 addresses are in use by the company: Level 1, 109 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 (type: physical, registered). Level 1, 109 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland had been their physical address, up to 05 Dec 2014. Dawson Farms Limited used more aliases, namely: Rawene Enterprises Seventeen Limited from 03 Dec 1999 to 02 Aug 2002. 100 shares are issued to 3 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 2 entities and holds 99 shares (99% of shares), namely:
Spence, Andrew George (an individual) located at Birkenhead, Auckland postcode 0626,
Dawson, Craig Keith Robert (an individual) located at Rd 5, Warkworth postcode 0985. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 1% of all shares (1 share); it includes
Dawson, Craig Keith Robert (an individual) - located at Rd 5, Warkworth. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 15 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 109 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered & service | 05 Dec 2014 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Craig Keith Robert Dawson
Rd 5, Warkworth, 0985
Address used since 30 Jul 2015 |
Director | 24 Jul 2002 - current |
Anthony Walpole Bowden
Greenhithe, Auckland,
Address used since 03 Dec 1999 |
Director | 03 Dec 1999 - 24 Jul 2002 |
Steven Francis Clerk
Parnell, Auckland,
Address used since 03 Dec 1999 |
Director | 03 Dec 1999 - 24 Jul 2002 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 1, 109 Carlton Gore Road, Newmarket, Auckland, 1023 | Physical & registered | 18 Apr 2013 - 05 Dec 2014 |
Offices Of Bowden, Impey & Sage, 470 Parnell Rd, Auckland 1 | Registered & physical | 22 Apr 2001 - 22 Apr 2001 |
Offices Of Hayes Knight, 470 Parnell Rd, Auckland 1 | Registered & physical | 22 Apr 2001 - 18 Apr 2013 |
Offices Of Bowden, Impey & Sage, 470 Parnell Rd, Auckland 1 | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 22 Apr 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Spence, Andrew George Individual |
Birkenhead Auckland 0626 |
24 Mar 2009 - current |
Dawson, Craig Keith Robert Individual |
Rd 5 Warkworth 0985 |
03 Dec 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dawson, Craig Keith Robert Individual |
Rd 5 Warkworth 0985 |
03 Dec 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Waite, Bruce Henry Individual |
Matakana North Auckland |
03 Dec 1999 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Arnott's New Zealand Limited Level 1, 61-73 Davis Crescent |
|
Cornwall Trustees 73 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Cornwall Trustees 72 Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |
|
Auckland Plumbers Group Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Your Property Services Limited Level 4, 19 Morgan Street |
|
Grovers Investments Limited Level 6, 135 Broadway |