Tkg 21 Limited (issued an NZBN of 9429037474102) was registered on 27 Sep 1999. 4 addresses are currently in use by the company: Unit 1, 172 French Pass Road, Rd 4, Cambridge, 3496 (type: registered, service). C/-Tait Fleming, Chartered Accountants, 29 Elliott Street, Opotiki had been their registered address, up until 06 Jul 2002. 2000 shares are issued to 2 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group includes 1 entity and holds 1000 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
The Estate Of Kj Murray (an other) located at Rd 4, Cambridge postcode 3496. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 50 per cent of all shares (1000 shares); it includes
The Estate Of Dj Murray (an other) - located at Rd 4, Cambridge. Businesscheck's information was last updated on 27 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
29 Elliott Street, Opotiki | Registered & physical & service | 06 Jul 2002 |
Unit 1, 172 French Pass Road, Rd 4, Cambridge, 3496 | Registered & service | 29 Feb 2024 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Andrew Peter Murray
Lynfield, Auckland, 1042
Address used since 29 May 2023 |
Director | 29 May 2023 - current |
Kirsten Jill Allison
Rd 4, Cambridge, 3496
Address used since 29 May 2023 |
Director | 29 May 2023 - current |
Katherine Jill Murray
Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120
Address used since 20 Jul 2016 |
Director | 01 Mar 2000 - 16 Jun 2023 |
Donald Ross Murray
Whakatane, Whakatane, 3120
Address used since 20 Jul 2016 |
Director | 01 Mar 2000 - 16 Jun 2023 |
Ian Roger Peterson
Opotiki,
Address used since 27 Sep 1999 |
Director | 27 Sep 1999 - 01 Mar 2000 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
C/-tait Fleming, Chartered Accountants, 29 Elliott Street, Opotiki | Registered | 02 Aug 2000 - 06 Jul 2002 |
C/-tait Fleming, Chartered Accountants, 29 Elliott Street, Opotiki | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 02 Aug 2000 |
C/-tait Fleming, Chartered Accountants, 29 Elliott Street, Opotiki | Physical | 27 Sep 1999 - 27 Sep 1999 |
C/-tait Fleming Ltd, Chartered Accountants, 29 Elliott Street, Opotiki | Physical | 27 Sep 1999 - 06 Jul 2002 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Estate Of Kj Murray Other (Other) |
Rd 4 Cambridge 3496 |
04 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
The Estate Of Dj Murray Other (Other) |
Rd 4 Cambridge 3496 |
04 Jul 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Murray, Donald Ross Individual |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
27 Sep 1999 - 04 Jul 2023 |
Murray, Katherine Jill Individual |
Whakatane Whakatane 3120 |
27 Sep 1999 - 04 Jul 2023 |
Green Bees Limited 29 Elliott Street |
|
Teeny Weeny Investments Limited 29 Elliott Street |
|
Gsl Limited 29 Elliott Street |
|
Lowe Motor Group Limited 29 Elliott Street |
|
Majac Holdings Limited 29 Elliott Street |
|
Ocean Ridge Orchards Limited 29 Elliott Street |