Arawata Properties Limited (issued a New Zealand Business Number of 9429037558321) was registered on 15 Jun 1999. 5 addresess are in use by the company: Po Box 389, Waikato Mail Centre, Hamilton, 3240 (type: postal, office). 4 Pembroke Lane, Hamilton had been their registered address, up until 22 Feb 2001. 1000 shares are issued to 4 shareholders who belong to 2 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 500 shares (50 per cent of shares), namely:
Marcus & Associates Two Limited (an entity) located at Hamilton Lake, Hamilton postcode 3204. In the second group, a total of 3 shareholders hold 50 per cent of all shares (exactly 500 shares); it includes
Ammann, Diane Eleanor (an individual) - located at Rd 1, Ohaupo,
Eltan (Ammann) Trustee Company Limited (an entity) - located at 19 Knox Street, Hamilton,
Ammann, Thomas Konrad (a director) - located at Kaipaki. Businesscheck's database was updated on 02 Aug 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
91 Clarence Street, Hamilton | Physical & registered & service | 22 Feb 2001 |
Po Box 389, Waikato Mail Centre, Hamilton, 3240 | Postal | 10 Nov 2020 |
91 Clarence Street, Hamilton Lake, Hamilton, 3204 | Office & delivery | 10 Nov 2020 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
Thomas Konrad Ammann
Rd 1, Ohaupo, 3881
Address used since 21 Jul 2015 |
Director | 15 Jun 1999 - current |
Norman William Hawes
Hamilton Lake, Hamilton, 3204
Address used since 21 Jul 2015 |
Director | 15 Jun 1999 - current |
91 Clarence Street , Hamilton Lake , Hamilton , 3204 |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
4 Pembroke Lane, Hamilton | Registered & physical | 22 Feb 2001 - 22 Feb 2001 |
4 Pembroke Lane, Hamilton | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 22 Feb 2001 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Marcus & Associates Two Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429051165383 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Hamilton Lake Hamilton 3204 |
11 Oct 2023 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Ammann, Diane Eleanor Individual |
Rd 1 Ohaupo 3881 |
23 Aug 2012 - current |
Eltan (ammann) Trustee Company Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429030594784 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
19 Knox Street Hamilton 3204 |
23 Aug 2012 - current |
Ammann, Thomas Konrad Director |
Kaipaki |
23 Aug 2012 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Owen, Richard Kenneth Individual |
Hamilton |
15 Jun 1999 - 11 Oct 2023 |
Owen, Richard Kenneth Individual |
Hamilton |
15 Jun 1999 - 11 Oct 2023 |
Hawes, Ursula Elizabeth Individual |
Hamilton |
15 Jun 1999 - 11 Oct 2023 |
Owen, Richard Kenneth Individual |
Hamilton |
15 Jun 1999 - 11 Oct 2023 |
Owen, Richard Kenneth Individual |
Hamilton |
15 Jun 1999 - 11 Oct 2023 |
Hawes, Norman William Individual |
Hamilton |
15 Jun 1999 - 11 Oct 2023 |
Ammann, Diane Eleanor Individual |
Kaipaki |
15 Jun 1999 - 21 Dec 2009 |
Ammann, Thomas Konrad Individual |
Kaipaki |
21 Dec 2009 - 23 Aug 2012 |
Ammann, Thomas Konrad Individual |
Kaipaki |
15 Jun 1999 - 21 Dec 2009 |
T K Ammann Family Trust Other |
21 Dec 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 | |
Null - T K Ammann Family Trust Other |
21 Dec 2009 - 27 Jun 2010 |
Prestidge Group NZ Limited 91 Clarence Street |
|
Clinique Elan Limited 91 Clarence Street |
|
Rj Hartles 2010 Limited 91 Clarence Street |
|
Qrd Limited 91 Clarence Street |
|
Cmlg Limited 91 Clarence Street |
|
Mark Gemmell Custom Cars Limited 91 Clarence Stree |