Rajjo Nominees Share Portfolio Limited (issued an NZ business identifier of 9429037638146) was incorporated on 11 Mar 1999. 4 addresses are in use by the company: 380 Karori Road, Karori, Wellington, 6012 (type: registered, service). Level 2, 116 Lambton Quay, Wellington Central, Wellington had been their registered address, until 01 Jun 2021. 100 shares are issued to 5 shareholders who belong to 5 shareholder groups. The first group consists of 1 entity and holds 20 shares (20 per cent of shares), namely:
Dean, Olivia Schatzi Margaret (an individual) located at Wellington. In the second group, a total of 1 shareholder holds 20 per cent of all shares (20 shares); it includes
Rajjo Nominees Limited (an entity) - located at Karori, Wellington. Next there is the 3rd group of shareholders, share allotment (20 shares, 20%) belongs to 1 entity, namely:
Dean, John Andrew, located at Wellington (an individual). Businesscheck's information was last updated on 05 Sep 2024.
Current address | Type | Used since |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 116 Lambton Quay, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Physical & service | 07 Jun 2019 |
Level 1, 116 Lambton Quay, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 01 Jun 2021 |
380 Karori Road, Karori, Wellington, 6012 | Registered & service | 30 Jan 2023 |
Name and Address | Role | Period |
---|---|---|
John Andrew Dean
Karori, Wellington, 6012
Address used since 11 May 2010 |
Director | 11 Mar 1999 - current |
Previous address | Type | Period |
---|---|---|
Level 2, 116 Lambton Quay, Wellington Central, Wellington, 6011 | Registered | 07 Jun 2019 - 01 Jun 2021 |
7/114 Lambton Quay, Wellington | Registered | 13 Apr 2000 - 07 Jun 2019 |
C/- John Dean Law Office, 7/114 Lambton Quay, Wellington | Registered | 12 Apr 2000 - 13 Apr 2000 |
7/114 Lambton Quay, Wellington | Physical | 11 Mar 1999 - 07 Jun 2019 |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dean, Olivia Schatzi Margaret Individual |
Wellington |
11 Mar 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Rajjo Nominees Limited Shareholder NZBN: 9429038537875 Entity (NZ Limited Company) |
Karori Wellington 6012 |
11 Mar 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dean, John Andrew Individual |
Wellington |
11 Mar 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Barton, Rachael Isobel Individual |
Wellington |
11 Mar 1999 - current |
Shareholder Name | Address | Period |
---|---|---|
Dean, Jeremy James Barton Individual |
Wellington |
11 Mar 1999 - current |
Telemnar Limited Levels 11-16 |
|
Institute Of Public Administration Of New Zealand Incorporated Level 3, Rutherford House |
|
Asian Pacific Copyright Association Incorporated School Of Accounting & Commercial Law |
|
Community Media Trust 19 Kate Sheppard Place |
|
Zap Limited 7/114 Lambton Quay |
|
Fraoch Trustee Limited 7/116 Lambton Quay |